Lerman v. Swarovski North America Limited et al

Plaintiff: Anna Lerman
Defendant: Swarovski Digital Business USA Inc., Swarovski North America Limited, Swarovski Retail Ventures Limited and Does 1 Through 100
Case Number: 3:2019cv00638
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Motion to Continue Briefing Schedule (Dkt. #8 ). Plaintiff shall file her opposition to Defendants' by 8/12/2019. Defendants shall file their reply by 8/30/2019. The motion hearing is rescheduled for 9/9/2019 at 11:30 AM before Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/24/2019. (jdt)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue to Set Briefing Schedule and Move Hearing Date for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Swarovski North America Limited. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (jdt).
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Swarovski Digital Business USA Inc., Swarovski North America Limited, Swarovski Retail Ventures Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proof of Service)(Sheridan, Stephanie)Attorney Stephanie A. Sheridan added to party Swarovski Digital Business USA Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A. Sheridan added to party Swarovski Retail Ventures Limited(pty:dft) (jdt).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Extension of Time (Dkt. #5 ). Defendants shall file their response by 6/10/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/6/2019. (jdt)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Swarovski North America Limited. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (jdt).
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court by Swarovski North America Limited re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sheridan, Stephanie) (jdt).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Extension of Time (Dkt. #2 ). Defendants shall file their response by 5/10/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/11/2019. (jdt)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Swarovski North America Limited. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (jdt).
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of CA, County of SD, case number 37-02019-00011559-CU-BT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12370073), filed by Swarovski North America Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00638-LAB-BLM. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(cdw)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lerman v. Swarovski North America Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swarovski Digital Business USA Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swarovski North America Limited
Represented By: Stephanie A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swarovski Retail Ventures Limited
Represented By: Stephanie A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Lerman
Represented By: Zev Benjamin Zysman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?