Schertzer v. Samsonite Company Stores, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Schertzer
Defendant: Samsonite Company Stores, LLC and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2019cv00639
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Samsonite Company Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Proof of Service)(Sheridan, Stephanie) (jpp).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Second Joint Motion to extend Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Class Action to Complaint to on or before 6/10/2019. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/08/2019. (jpp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Samsonite Company Stores, LLC. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (jpp).
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court by Samsonite Company Stores, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sheridan, Stephanie) (jpp).
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Joint Motion to extend Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint to on or before 5/10/2019. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/12/2019. (jpp)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Samsonite Company Stores, LLC. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (jpp).
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Samsonite Company Stores, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. Identifying Other Affiliate Samsonite LLC for Samsonite Company Stores, LLC. (cdw)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of CA, County of SD, case number 37-02019-00011100-CU-MC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12370102), filed by Samsonite Company Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of John B. Livingston, #3 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00639-JLS-MSB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(cdw) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schertzer v. Samsonite Company Stores, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsonite Company Stores, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Schertzer
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?