Calderon v. Kate Spade & Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Marilu Calderon and Kristen Schertzer
Defendant: Kate Spade & Company, LLC and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2019cv00674
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: William V Gallo
3 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Consolidated Class Action Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Marilu Calderon, Kristen Schertzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Carpenter, Todd) (acc).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #5 Consolidation; Denying as Moot Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Strike 19-cv-0330. The Court ORDERS as follows:1. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), Calderon v. Kate Spade & Co., LLC, 3:19-cv-00674-AJB-JLB and Schertzer v. Kate Spade & Co., LLC, No. 3:19-cv-00330-AJB-JLB are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes (the "Consolidated Action"). All filings by a party must be made only in the Consolidated Action and must bear the following caption: Calderon, et al. v. Kate Spade & Co., LLC, 3:19-cv-00674-AJB-JLB. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/20/2019. (acc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Marilu Calderon Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. (Wolfson, Tina) (acc).
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Set Briefing Schedule filed by Marilu Calderon. (Wolfson, Tina) (acc).
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Set Briefing Schedule filed by Kate Spade & Company, LLC. (Russell, Bridget) (acc).
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget J. Russell on behalf of Kate Spade & Company, LLC (Russell, Bridget)Attorney Bridget J. Russell added to party Kate Spade & Company, LLC(pty:dft) (acc).
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan John Price on behalf of Kate Spade & Company, LLC (Price, Dylan)Attorney Dylan John Price added to party Kate Spade & Company, LLC(pty:dft) (ag).
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Craig Cardon on behalf of Kate Spade & Company, LLC (Cardon, Phillip)Attorney Phillip Craig Cardon added to party Kate Spade & Company, LLC(pty:dft) (acc).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases; MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Set Briefing Schedule : Responses due by 6/5/2019; Replies due by 6/12/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 8/1/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Set Briefing Schedule by Marilu Calderon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tina Wolfson, #2 Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Tina) QC mailer sent re: proposed order attached (tcf).
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilu Calderon. Kate Spade & Company, LLC served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wolfson, Tina)(acc).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. Judge Janis L. Sammartino, Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-00330-AJB-JLB. The new case number is 19CV0674-AJB(JLB).. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/22/2019. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/12/2019.(jpp)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als)(jao).
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-50, Kate Spade & Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12397925.), filed by Marilu Calderon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00674-JLS-WVG. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Wolfson, Tina)(als) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calderon v. Kate Spade & Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Spade & Company, LLC
Represented By: Dylan John Price
Represented By: Bridget J. Russell
Represented By: Phillip Craig Cardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilu Calderon
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Schertzer
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Edwin John Kilpela, Jr.
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?