Mr. Herbert Johnson v. CCI M. Hill et al

Plaintiff: Herbert Johnson
Defendant: Librarian C. Tiscorrin, M Hill, Marty, Homer and CO Bowart
Case Number: 3:2019cv00683
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the case is dismissed sua sponte without prejudice. The Court certifies that an IFP appeal from this Order would be frivolous and therefore, would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)(sjt).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: 1) Denying Plaintiff Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as Barred by 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) (ECF No. #2 ); and 2) Dismissing Civil Action Without Prejudice for Failure to Pay Filing Fee Required by 28 U.S.C. 1914(a). The Court certifies that an IFP appeal from this Order would be frivolous and therefore, not taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to close the file. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/12/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt) (Main Document 17 replaced on 6/13/2019. NEF regenerated) (jdt).
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 Miscellaneous Document & Exhibit by Herbert Johnson. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/10/2019 (jms)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document: Miscellaneous Document & Exhibit, from Plaintiff Herbert Johnson. Non-compliance with local rule(s) Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(d) - Supplemental pleadings require court order., S.D. Cal. CivLR 15.1.a Amended pleadings must be complete in itself, S.D. Cal. CivLR 5.1.e Exhibits must be attached to the documents to which they belong. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/10/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/11/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 Supplemental Exhibits by Herbert Johnson.Nunc Pro Tunc 6/5/2019 (jms)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document: Supplemental Exhibits, from Plaintiff Herbert Johnson. Non-compliance with local rule(s): CivLR 5.1.e: Exhibits must be attached to the documents to which they belong. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/5/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/6/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 Supplemental & Duplicate Exhibits in Support of Complaint [ECF No.1]] by Herbert Johnson. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/16/2019.(jms)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document: Supplemental & Duplicate Exhibits in Support of Complaint [ECF No. #1 ], from Plaintiff Herbert Johnson. Non-compliance with local rule(s) Civ.L.Rule 83.9 Parties to an action must refrain from writing ex parte letters to the judge; CivLR 5.1.e: Exhibits must be attached to the documents to which they belong. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/16/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/17/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 Additional Exhibits in Support of Complaint [ECF No. #1 ] by Herbert Johnson. Nunc Pro Tunc 4/30/2019.(jms)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document: Letter & Exhibits, from Plaintiff Herbert Johnson. Non-compliance with local rule(s) Civ.L.Rule 83.9 Parties to an action must refrain from writing ex parte letters to the judge, CivLR 5.1.eExhibits must be attached to the documents to which they belong. Nunc Pro Tunc 4/30/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/1/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 Exhibits in Support of Complaint [ECF No. #1 ] by Herbert Johnson Nunc Pro Tunc 4/26/2019 (jms) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/29/2019) (jms).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document: Exhibits in Support of Complaint [ECF No. #1 ], from Plaintiff Herbert Johnson. Non-compliance with local rule(s) S.D. Cal. CivLR 83.9: Ex parte letters to the judge are prohibited. S.D. Cal. CivLR 5.1.e: Exhibits must be attached to the documents to which they belong. Nunc Pro Tunc 4/26/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/29/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-02308. Original file received electronically. (jms) (jao).
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jms)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge John D. Early transferring case to United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Original file, copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 4/15/2019.]
March 28, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(mba) [Transferred from California Central on 4/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 4/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Herbert Johnson. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 4/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Bowart, M. Hill, Homer, Marty, C. Tiscorrin pursuant to 42 USC 1983pr. Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early, filed by plaintiff Herbert Johnson. (esa)[Transferred from California Central on 4/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mr. Herbert Johnson v. CCI M. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Librarian C. Tiscorrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Bowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?