Williams et al v. Camden Old Creek et al

Plaintiff: Shaliecia Williams and S.W.
Defendant: Birchwood Associates LLC, DOES 1 through 10, Camden Old Creek, Cortez Development Group, LLC and Camden USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00691
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY - Other re #13 Response to Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Camden Old Creek, Camden USA, Inc. (Stone, Sage) (acc).
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by S.W., Shaliecia Williams, Shaliecia Williams. (Fagan, Craig) (tcf).
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #9 Summons Issued, #8 Amended Complaint as to all Defendants Acknowledgement filed by S.W., Shaliecia Williams, Shaliecia Williams. (Fagan, Craig) (acc).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint : Responses due by 5/24/2019; Replies due by 5/31/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 7/18/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Camden Old Creek, Camden USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties, #2 Supplement Proposed Order)(Gordon, Eli)Attorney Eli A. Gordon added to party Camden Old Creek(pty:dft), Attorney Eli A. Gordon added to party Camden USA, Inc.(pty:dft) QC re: proposed order (acc).
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued re #8 Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 4, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Camden Old Creek, Camden USA, Inc., filed by Shaliecia Williams, Shaliecia Williams, S.W. New Summons Requested. (Fagan, Craig) (acc).
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaliecia Williams, Shaliecia Williams, S.W. Cortez Development Group, LLC served. (Fagan, Craig)(acc).
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaliecia Williams, Shaliecia Williams, S.W.. Camden Old Creek served. (Fagan, Craig) (tcf).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The petition is granted and Shaliecia Williams is appointed as the guardian ad litem for the minor child, S.W., for the entirety of this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/16/2019. (acc)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties by S.W., Shaliecia Williams re #1 Complaint, (Fagan, Craig) (acc).
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem for minor plaintiff, S.W. by S.W., Shaliecia Williams. (Fagan, Craig)(acc).
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Birchwood Associates LLC, Camden Old Creek, Cortez Development Group, LLC, DOES 1 through 10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12411367.), filed by Shaliecia Williams, S.W..The new case number is 3:19-cv-00691-AJB-NLS. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Fagan, Craig)(mme) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Camden Old Creek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birchwood Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden Old Creek
Represented By: Eli A. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortez Development Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden USA, Inc.
Represented By: Eli A. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaliecia Williams
Represented By: Craig P. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.W.
Represented By: Craig P. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?