Abbas Hosseini v. Warden
Petitioner: Abbas Hosseini
Respondent: - Warden
Case Number: 3:2019cv00710
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 Letter with documents from Petitioner. Nunc pro tunc 4/29/19 (dlg)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Letter with Documents, from Petitioner Abbas Hosseini. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L.Rule 83.9 Parties to an action must refrain from writing ex parte letters to the judge. Nunc Pro Tunc 4/29/19. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/1/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-02529. Original file received electronically
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jms)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. (see document for further details) Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241). Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Abbas Hosseini. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 4/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbas Hosseini v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: - Warden
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abbas Hosseini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?