Unite Here Local 30 v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Petitioner: Unite Here Local 30
Respondent: Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00830
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0004
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond. Pursuant to the stipulation between Plaintiff Unite Here Local 30 and Defendant Omni Hotels Management Corporation d/b/a Omni La Costa Resort & Spa, good cause appearing, the Court grants the parties' joint motion to extend Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's petition to compel arbitration. Accordingly, Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's petition on or before 7/10/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/25/2019. (rmc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to Local Rules 7.2 and 12.1 by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Ball, Robin)Attorney Robin Dale Ball added to party Omni Hotels Management Corporation(pty:res) (rmc).
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (rmc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Unite Here Local 30 as to Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Weber, Kimberley)(rmc).
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Unite Here Local 30. (no document attached)(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unite Here Local 30 v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Represented By: Robin Dale Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Unite Here Local 30
Represented By: Kimberley Clare Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?