Davis v. Adler et al
Plaintiff: Gavin B. Davis
Defendant: Cornell University, Sami Rashid, John Doe, Cameron Fife, U.S. Navy Commander, Seal Team 10, Timothy P. O'Hara, Jonathan Newton and Jason M. Adler
Case Number: 3:2019cv00834
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: Karen S Crawford
3 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Gavin B. Davis. Nunc pro tunc 6/25/2019. (acc)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Accepting Document #11 : Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to One Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 4) the Complaint (Doc. 1), from Plaintiff Gavin B. Davis. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.2 - Missing Proof of Service. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/25/2019. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/27/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss, #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Gavin B. Davis. (acc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Valerie Phan by Valerie Phan on behalf of Jonathan Newton, Timothy P. O'Hara, Sami Rashid (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Notice of Appearance)(Phan, Valerie)Attorney Valerie Phan added to party Jonathan Newton(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie Phan added to party Timothy P. O'Hara(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie Phan added to party Sami Rashid(pty:dft)(acc).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #6 MOTION to Dismiss : Responses due by 6/27/2019; Replies due by 7/11/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 8/15/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Jason M. Adler. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(acc)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Battaglia: Setting Briefing Schedule re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint : Responses due by 6/27/2019; Replies due by 7/11/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 8/15/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Jonathan Newton, Timothy P. O'Hara, Sami Rashid. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants Sami Rashid, Jonathan Newton, and Timothy P. O'Hara's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Proof of Service of Mailing to Pro Se Plaintiff, Gavin B. Davis)(Kosmo, Frederick)Attorney Frederick William Kosmo, Jr added to party Jonathan Newton(pty:dft), Attorney Frederick William Kosmo, Jr added to party Timothy P. O'Hara(pty:dft), Attorney Frederick William Kosmo, Jr added to party Sami Rashid(pty:dft) (acc).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. Judge Janis L. Sammartino, Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:17-cv-00387-AJB-JLB. The new case number is 19CV0834-AJB(JLB).. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/09/2019. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/07/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (als) (jao).
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason M. Adler, Cornell University, John Doe(Affiliates of Adler, as Individuals or Entities), John Doe(Members of the Former Chi Chapter of Psi Upsilon, Cornell University, as Individuals), Cameron Fife, Jonathan Newton, Timothy P. O'Hara, Sami Rashid, U.S. Navy Commander, Seal Team 10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS111447.), filed by Gavin B. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00834-JLS-KSC. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Davis, Gavin)(als) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Adler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin B. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sami Rashid
Represented By: Frederick William Kosmo, Jr.
Represented By: Valerie Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Fife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Navy Commander, Seal Team 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy P. O'Hara
Represented By: Frederick William Kosmo, Jr.
Represented By: Valerie Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Newton
Represented By: Frederick William Kosmo, Jr.
Represented By: Valerie Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason M. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?