Ewing v. Aliera Healthcare

Plaintiff: Anton Ewing
Defendant: Aliera Healthcare
Case Number: 3:2019cv00845
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Aliera Healthcare [Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan] (Rackers, Mark) (jdt).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion for Short Continuance of Early Neutral Evaluation. The Early Neutral Evaluation scheduled for 7/11/2019 has been continued to 7/19/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/20/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jrm). (jao).
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue [Ex Parte Application for Short Continuance of Early Neutral Evaluation] by Aliera Healthcare. (Rackers, Mark) (jdt).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 7/11/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. In the event the case does not settle during the ENE, the Court will conduct an Initial Case Management Conference. The parties must file a Joint Discovery Plan on the CM/ECF system no later than 7/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/3/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, [Answer and Affirmative Defenses] by Aliera Healthcare.(Rackers, Mark)Attorney Mark G. Rackers added to party Aliera Healthcare(pty:dft) (jdt).
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Unavailability by Anton Ewing. (jdt)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anton Ewing. Aliera Healthcare served. (jdt)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED SUMMONS Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (cdw)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (als) (jao).
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Aliera Healthcare ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS111491.), filed by Anton Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00845-LAB-LL. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Ewing, Anton)(als) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing v. Aliera Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliera Healthcare
Represented By: Mark G. Rackers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?