Ewing v. Pollard

Plaintiff: Anton Ewing
Defendant: Mark Pollard
Case Number: 3:2019cv00855
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anton Ewing. Mark Pollard served. (anh)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying Ex Parte Request to Serve by Publication [Doc. no. #5 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/21/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Service by Publication by Anton Ewing. (anh)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Unavailability by Anton Ewing (anh)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19-CV-00855-CAB-BGS.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (als)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jxv) (jao).
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mark Pollard ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS111573.), filed by Anton Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Reciept of Payment)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00855-MMA-BGS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Ewing, Anton)(jxv) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing v. Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?