Parthemer v. Payment Management Services USA, LLC

Plaintiff: Samuel Parthemer
Defendant: Payment Management Services USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00886
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Samuel Parthemer (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shay, Daniel). Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Samuel Parthemer (pty:pla). (jah).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Parthemer. Payment Management Services USA, LLC served. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana). (jah).
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbas Kazerounian on behalf of Samuel . Attorney Abbas Kazerounian added to party Samuel Parthemer (pty:pla). Modified on 5/16/2019 - Removed added duplicate text (jah).
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Yana A. Hart on behalf of Samuel Parthemer (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana). Attorney Yana A. Hart added to party Samuel Parthemer (pty:pla). Modified on 5/16/2019 - Removed added duplicate text (jah).
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao).
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Payment Management Services USA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12500707.), filed by Samuel Parthemer.The new case number is 3:19-cv-00886-H-MSB. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Swigart, Joshua)(mme) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parthemer v. Payment Management Services USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Parthemer
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payment Management Services USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?