George v. Spearmen et al
Petitioner: Joseph George
Respondent: M. Spearmen and Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 3:2019cv00895
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 USCA Case Number 19-55769 for #14 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Joseph George. (akr)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 Motion for Permission to Appeal in forma pauperis by Joseph George. (The document was received in the US Court of Appeals on 7/3/2019 and was forwarded to the US District Court Clerk for filing t/w #14 Notice of Appeal.) (akr)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit t/w Motion for Permission to Appeal in forma pauperis by Joseph George. IFP Status. (The document was received in the US Court of Appeals on 7/3/2019 and was forwarded to the US District Court Clerk for processing as a Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals.) (akr)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of USCA as to #9 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Joseph George. A review of the record demonstrates that the USCA lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Dismissed. (akr)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying #10 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 06/17/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme). (Modified on 6/17/2019: USCA Case Number 19-55673. Order electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals via regenerated NEF.) (akr). (jao).
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 USCA Case Number 19-55673 for #9 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Joseph George. (akr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Joseph George. (Submitted t/w #9 Notice of Appeal.) (akr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit t/w Motion for a Certificate of Appealabiliity by Joseph George as to #3 Order Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. IFP Status. (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals.) (akr)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis [ECF. No. #7 ] as Moot. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/11/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/11/2019) (anh).
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph George. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/31/2019 (anh)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo Accepting Document: Motion to Proceed IFP, from Petitioner Joseph George. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Duplicate Motion filed (ECF No. #4 ). Nunc Pro Tunc 5/31/2019. Signed by chambers of Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/4/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/29/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph George. (jms)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/14/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(IFP and complaint form mailed with order)(anh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit by Joseph George re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jms)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Xavier Becerra, M. Spearmen, filed by Joseph George.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-895-CAB-RBB. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case.(jms) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. Spearmen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. Spearmen
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?