Kant v. Vey's Powersports, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Kant
Defendant: Suzuki Motor of America, Inc., Vey's Powersports, Inc. and DOES 1 to 50
Case Number: 3:2019cv00898
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred to Central District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *Central District of California*.*312 N. Spring Street**Los Angeles, CA 90012*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Transfer Order) (anh) (jao).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Transferring Case to The United States Bankruptcy Court: Central District of California. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/28/2019.(anh)(Order forwarded to Bankruptcy Court of Central District of California)(sjt).
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Notice)(Bergstrom, Emily) (anh).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/14/2019.(anh)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/14/2019.(anh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. (mme)(jrd)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Vey's Powersports, Inc.. (mme)(jrd)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.(mme)(jrd)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Suzuki Motor Corporation for Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. (mme)(jrd)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand From Superior Court of CA, San Diego, case number 37-2019-00007141-CU-PA-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12504803.), filed by Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 - Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00898-CAB-JLB. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(mme)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kant v. Vey's Powersports, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vey's Powersports, Inc.
Represented By: Robert T. Bergsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Kant
Represented By: Alicia Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?