Gustine v. County of San Diego et al

Plaintiff: Brent Edward Gustine
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive and County of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2019cv00903
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Martin on behalf of County of San Diego (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Martin, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer Marie Martin added to party County of San Diego(pty:dft) (jdt).
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by County of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Holmes, Melissa)Attorney Melissa Maria Holmes added to party County of San Diego(pty:dft) (jdt).
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jms)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against County of San Diego, Does 1 through 10 inclusive, filed by Brent Edward Gustine.(Filing fee $400 - receipt number: 0974-12506282) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-903-LAB-NLS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Carr, Peter) (jms) (jao). Modified on 5/14/2019 to remove case in screening text (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gustine v. County of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Edward Gustine
Represented By: Peter L. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Martin
Represented By: Melissa Maria Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?