Powell v. Basto et al
Plaintiff: Lloyd Powell
Defendant: Adelita Basto, S. Gates, M. Glynn and M.D. S. Roberts
Case Number: 3:2019cv00913
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and Dismissing Complaint for Failing to State a Claim. The Court: Directs the Secretary of the CDCR, or his designee, to collect fromPlaintiff's prison trust account the $350 filing fee owed in this case; Directs the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of this Order on Ralph Diaz, Secretary, CDCR; Dismisses Plaintiffs Complaint and grants 45 days leave from the date of this Order in which to file an Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint within the time provided, the Court will enter a final Order dismissing this civil action. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/3/19. (All non-registered users * Ralph Diaz, Secretary, CDCR, served via U.S. Mail Service )(dlg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Exhibits in Support of Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) by Lloyd Powell. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/13/2019.(jms)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Exhibits in Support of Complaint (ECF No. #1 ), from Plaintiff Lloyd Powell. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Untimely per GO653A. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/13/2019. Signed by the Chambers Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/14/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lloyd Powell. (jms)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lloyd Powell. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc 5/4/2019(jms)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Adelita Basto, S. Gates, M. Glynn, S. Roberts, filed by Lloyd Powell.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CDCR Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-913-GPC-NLS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] Filed Nunc Pro Tunc 5/4/2019.(jms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Basto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adelita Basto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?