Clemmensen v. Azar, II
Plaintiff: Kirk Clemmensen
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 3:2019cv00936
Filed: May 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395hr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Notice of Withdrawal of Document re #3 Motion to Seal a Previously Filed Document. The Court interprets Plaintiff's motion as a notice of withdrawal of document. Accordingly, the original Complaint and all attached exhibits are withdrawn from the docket. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/8/2019. (jao)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected Complaint against Alex M. Azar, II, filed by Kirk Clemmensen. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Meagher-Leonard, Rosemary) (jao).
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document by Kirk Clemmensen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Notice Proposed order)(Meagher-Leonard, Rosemary) QC mail sent on 7/5/2019 re e-filed proposed order (rmc).
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme)
May 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12527097.), filed by Kirk Clemmensen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-H)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00936-W-WVG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Meagher-Leonard, Rosemary)(mme) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemmensen v. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Clemmensen
Represented By: Rosemary J Meagher-Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?