San Diego Coastkeeper et al v. Palomar Transfer Station, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: San Diego Coastkeeper and Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation
Defendant: Palomar Transfer Station, Inc. and Coast Waste Management, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00957
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1251
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by San Diego Coastkeeper (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, Proposed Consent Decree)(McDonough, Patrick) (sjm).
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick John McDonough on behalf of San Diego Coastkeeper (McDonough, Patrick)Attorney Patrick John McDonough added to party San Diego Coastkeeper(pty:pla) (sjm).
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation, as to Coast Waste Management, Inc.. (Beaudin, Livia) (sjm).
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation, as to Palomar Transfer Station, Inc.. (Beaudin, Livia) (sjm).
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew John O'Malley on behalf of San Diego Coastkeeper (O'Malley, Matthew)Attorney Matthew John O'Malley added to party San Diego Coastkeeper(pty:pla) (sjm).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coast Waste Management, Inc., Palomar Transfer Station, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12540974.), filed by San Diego Coastkeeper, Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-957-JM-LL. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Beaudin, Livia)(jrm) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Diego Coastkeeper et al v. Palomar Transfer Station, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego Coastkeeper
Represented By: Matthew John O'Malley
Represented By: Livia Borak Beaudin
Represented By: Patrick John McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation
Represented By: Livia Borak Beaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palomar Transfer Station, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Waste Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?