Sikking et al v. Housing of Urban Development (HUD) et al
Plaintiff: Leon-Qiyam Pogue, Barbara Sikking and Jeff Sikking
Defendant: Doris O Britton, Onu Omordia, Richard C. Griswold, JPMorgan Chase Custody Services, Inc., City of San Diego in the State of California, Housing of Urban Development (HUD), DOES 1 to 10, Regis A. Guerin, The People of the State of California, Arcola Freeman, Kema Freeman, The City of San Diego, Mara W. Elliott and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01004
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
2 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Leon-Qiyam Pogue, Barbara Sikking, Jeff Sikking. Onu Omordia Dep City Attorney served. (jpp)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Leon-Qiyam Pogue, Barbara Sikking, Jeff Sikking. Mara Elliott City Attorney served. (jpp)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Leon-Qiyam Pogue, Barbara Sikking, Jeff Sikking. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. served. (jpp)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Leon-Qiyam Pogue, Barbara Sikking, Jeff Sikking. San Diego Code enforcement served. (jpp)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Leon-Qiyam Pogue, Barbara Sikking, Jeff Sikking. Housing & Urban Development served. (jpp)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Leon-Qiyam Pogue, Barbara Sikking, Jeff Sikking. Clerk for City of San Diego served. (jpp)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Leon-Qiyam Pogue, Barbara Sikking, Jeff Sikking. Richardson Griswold served.(jpp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Leon-Qiyam Pogue, Barbara Sikking, Jeff Sikking. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits) (jpp)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Honorable Nita L. Stormes recuses from this case and ORDERS that the case be reassigned to another magistrate judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19CV1004-JLS(KSC). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeff Sikking. (cdw)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barbara Sikking. (cdw)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leon-Qiyam Pogue. (cdw)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Doris O Britton, City of San Diego in the State of California, DOES 1 to 10, Mara W. Elliott, Arcola Freeman, Kema Freeman, Richard C. Griswold, Regis A. Guerin, Housing of Urban Development (HUD), JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Custody Services, Inc., Onu Omordia, The City of San Diego, The People of the State of California, IFP Filed, filed by Leon-Qiyam Pogue, Barbara Sikking, Jeff Sikking. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01004-JLS-NLS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Sikking, Jeff; Sikking, Barbara; Pogue, Leon-Qiyam)(cdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sikking et al v. Housing of Urban Development (HUD) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris O Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onu Omordia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Custody Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego in the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing of Urban Development (HUD)
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regis A. Guerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcola Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kema Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mara W. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon-Qiyam Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Sikking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Sikking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?