Moncreiff v. San Diego Unified School District
Plaintiff: Marianna Moncreiff
Defendant: San Diego Unified School District
Case Number: 3:2019cv01030
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Joint #11 Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. The ENE and CMC currently set for August 28, 2019 is hereby reset to September 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 7/26/19. (dlg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference by San Diego Unified School District. (Simpler, Phillip) (dlg).
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Simpler on behalf of San Diego Unified School District (Simpler, Phillip)Attorney Phillip Simpler added to party San Diego Unified School District(pty:dft) (dlg).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. The Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference currently scheduled for August 22, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. is reset to August 29, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. On or before August 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 7/19/19.(dlg)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation of your case will be held on August 22, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. in the chambers of the Honorable Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 7/12/19.(dlg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by San Diego Unified School District.(Sullivan, Michael) (dlg).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Joint #5 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant San Diego Unified School District to Answer Complaint to July 12,2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/3/19. (dlg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by San Diego Unified School District. (Sullivan, Michael) (jrm).
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by San Diego Unified School District re #3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by San Diego Unified School District . (Sullivan, Michael) (jrm).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 **Document Withdrawn per Dkt. No. #4 ** Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by San Diego Unified School District. (Sullivan, Michael)Attorney Michael Cody Sullivan added to party San Diego Unified School District(pty:dft) qc email, incorrect filer. Attorney should withdraw and refile with proper signature (dlg). Modified to withdraw on 7/5/2019 (jrm).
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm)
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against San Diego Unified School District ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12572782.), filed by Marianna Moncreiff. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1030-GPC-LL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Dodds, Bryce)(jrm) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moncreiff v. San Diego Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianna Moncreiff
Represented By: Bryce Aaron Dodds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Unified School District
Represented By: Phillip Simpler
Represented By: Michael Cody Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?