Leonard v. Nike, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kawhi Leonard
Defendant: Nike, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01035
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338cp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/15/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Rule 26(f) conference shall be completed by 10/17/2019. Joint Discovery Plan shall be filed in CM/ECF as well as lodged with Magistrate Judge Skomal by 11/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/22/2019. (jah)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Change Venue by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Dinusha Welliver, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Dinusha Welliver, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Dinusha Welliver, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Dinusha Welliver)(Duvdevani, Tamar). (jah).
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Kawhi Leonard by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Duvdevani, Tamar).Modified on 7/28/2019 - Missing caption for Counterclaim (jah).
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #14 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Duvdevani, Tamar) (rmc).
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Duvdevani, Tamar) (rmc).
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R. Ginsberg on behalf of Kawhi Leonard (Ginsberg, Peter). Attorney Peter R. Ginsberg added to party Kawhi Leonard (pty:pla). (jah).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Nike, Inc. answer due 7/17/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/24/2019. (jah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nike, Inc.. (Panikowski, Stanley). (jah).
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nike, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Panikowski, Stanley). (jah).
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 PRO HAC APPROVED: Tamar Duvdevani appearing for Defendant Nike, Inc. (no document attached) (dsn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 PRO HAC APPROVED: Matthew Nicholas Ganas appearing for Defendant Nike, Inc. (no document attached) (dsn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12640757.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Ganas, Matthew) (tcf).
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12640727.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Duvdevani, Tamar) (tcf).
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley J Panikowski, III on behalf of Nike, Inc. (Panikowski, Stanley)Attorney Stanley J Panikowski, III added to party Nike, Inc.(pty:dft) (tcf).
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kawhi Leonard. Nike, Inc. served. (Metzger, Scott). (jah).
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William Patrick Keith on behalf of Kawhi Leonard (Keith, William). Attorney William Patrick Keith added to party Kawhi Leonard (pty:pla). (jah).
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao).
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nike, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12576371.), filed by Kawhi Leonard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copyright Form) [Copyright Form Mailed]The new case number is 3:19-cv-1035-BAS-BGS. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Metzger, Scott)(jrm) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Nike, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawhi Leonard
Represented By: Scott L Metzger
Represented By: Peter R. Ginsberg
Represented By: William Patrick Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike, Inc.
Represented By: Stanley J Panikowski, III
Represented By: Tamar Duvdevani
Represented By: Matthew Nicholas Ganas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?