Abiyow et al v. Bristol Bay Native Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Abdullahi Warsame, Abdinur Jama, Kashindi Alulu, Mohamud H. Salad, Mohammed Mohammed, Mohamed Osman Jama, Tegest Alemu, Mohamud Abdi Shure, Abdi Hussein, Fatuma Ibrahim, Nyota Bokese, Lucy Nyirarwaka, Abdi Omar Yusaf, Lul Mohamed, Abdi Hagi Modowe, Semir Desta Tesema, Abdi Mwechiwa, Shukari Jama, Maymun Egal, Ali Hussein Shuriye, Ananie Rugenza, Bare Mahamed Musse, Hassan Omar, Said Abiyow, Kerai Mberwa and Shabani Bokese
Defendant: Bristol Bay Native Corporation, Glacier Technical Solutions, LLC and Workforce Resources, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01052
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
2 Judge: Marilyn L Huff
3 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:0206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference - An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference will be held in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on October 2, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 7/26/19.(dlg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy Nyirarwaka, Abdi Mwechiwa, Maymun Egal, Shukari Jama, Nyota Bokese, Abdinur Jama, Said Abiyow, Kerai Mberwa, Abdi Hussein, Mohammed Mohammed, Abdi Hagi Modowe, Lul Mohamed, Ananie Rugenza, Tegest Alemu, Abdi Omar Yusaf, Shabani Bokese, Mohamud H. Salad, Semir Desta Tesema, Fatuma Ibrahim, Abdullahi Warsame, Ali Hussein Shuriye, Hassan Omar, Mohamud Abdi Shure, Mohamed Osman Jama, Bare Mahamed Musse, Kashindi Alulu. All Defendants served. (Johnson, A) (dlg).
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy Nyirarwaka, Abdi Mwechiwa, Maymun Egal, Shukari Jama, Nyota Bokese, Abdinur Jama, Said Abiyow, Kerai Mberwa, Abdi Hussein, Mohammed Mohammed, Abdi Hagi Modowe, Lul Mohamed, Ananie Rugenza, Tegest Alemu, Shabani Bokese, Mohamud H. Salad, Semir Desta Tesema, Fatuma Ibrahim, Abdullahi Warsame, Ali Hussein Shuriye, Hassan Omar, Mohamud Abdi Shure, Mohamed Osman Jama, Bare Mahamed Musse, Kashindi Alulu. All Defendants served. (Johnson, A) (dlg).
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy Nyirarwaka, Abdi Mwechiwa, Maymun Egal, Shukari Jama, Nyota Bokese, Abdinur Jama, Said Abiyow, Kerai Mberwa, Abdi Hussein, Mohammed Mohammed, Abdi Hagi Modowe, Lul Mohamed, Ananie Rugenza, Tegest Alemu, Abdi Omar Yusaf, Shabani Bokese, Mohamud H. Salad, Semir Desta Tesema, Fatuma Ibrahim, Abdullahi Warsame, Ali Hussein Shuriye, Hassan Omar, Mohamud Abdi Shure, Mohamed Osman Jama, Bare Mahamed Musse, Kashindi Alulu. All Defendants served. (Johnson, A) Modif (dlg).
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Intent to Refile ECF 7; 7-1; and 7.2 by Said Abiyow, Tegest Alemu, Kashindi Alulu, Nyota Bokese, Shabani Bokese, Maymun Egal, Abdi Hussein, Fatuma Ibrahim, Abdinur Jama, Mohamed Osman Jama, Shukari Jama, Kerai Mberwa, Abdi Hagi Modowe, Lul Mohamed, Mohammed Mohammed, Bare Mahamed Musse, Abdi Mwechiwa, Lucy Nyirarwaka, Hassan Omar, Ananie Rugenza, Mohamud H. Salad, Mohamud Abdi Shure, Ali Hussein Shuriye, Semir Desta Tesema, Abdullahi Warsame, Abdi Omar Yusaf re #7 Summons Returned Executed,, (Johnson, A) (dlg).
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bristol Bay Native Corporation, Glacier Technical Solutions, LLC, Workforce Resources, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bristol Bay Native Corporation for Glacier Technical Solutions, LLC, Workforce Resources, LLC.. (Parti, Vani) (dlg).
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 9 *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy Nyirarwaka, Abdi Mwechiwa, Maymun Egal, Shukari Jama, Nyota Bokese, Abdinur Jama, Said Abiyow, Kerai Mberwa, Abdi Hussein, Mohammed Mohammed, Abdi Hagi Modowe, Lul Mohamed, Ananie Rugenza, Tegest Alemu, Abdi Omar Yusaf, Shabani Bokese, Mohamud H. Salad, Semir Desta Tesema, Fatuma Ibrahim, Abdullahi Warsame, Ali Hussein Shuriye, Hassan Omar, Mohamud Abdi Shure, Mohamed Osman Jama, Bare Mahamed Musse, Kashindi Alulu. All Defendants served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service, #2 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Johnson, A) qc email, each summons returned executed should be filed separately (dlg). Modified on 7/26/2019 (dlg).
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel for Defendants by Vani Parti on behalf of Bristol Bay Native Corporation, Glacier Technical Solutions, LLC, Workforce Resources, LLC (Parti, Vani)Attorney Vani Parti added to party Bristol Bay Native Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Vani Parti added to party Glacier Technical Solutions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Vani Parti added to party Workforce Resources, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Bristol Bay Native Corporation, Glacier Technical Solutions, LLC, Workforce Resources, LLC.(Todd-Gher, Amy)Attorney Amy Todd-Gher added to party Bristol Bay Native Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Todd-Gher added to party Glacier Technical Solutions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Todd-Gher added to party Workforce Resources, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:17-cv-01036-GPC-AGS. The new case number is 19cv1052-GPC-AGS.Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/12/2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/10/2019. (jah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Said Abiyow, Tegest Alemu, Kashindi Alulu, Nyota Bokese, Shabani Bokese, Maymun Egal, Abdi Hussein, Fatuma Ibrahim, Abdinur Jama, Mohamed Osman Jama, Shukari Jama, Kerai Mberwa, Abdi Hagi Modowe, Lul Mohamed, Mohammed Mohammed, Bare Mahamed Musse, Abdi Mwechiwa, Lucy Nyirarwaka, Hassan Omar, Ananie Rugenza, Mohamud H. Salad, Mohamud Abdi Shure, Ali Hussein Shuriye, Semir Desta Tesema, Abdullahi Warsame, Abdi Omar Yusaf of case(s) 17cv1036. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service)(Johnson, A). Modified on 6/10/2019 - Removed duplicate attachment description (jah).
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als) (jao).
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bristol Bay Native Corporation, Glacier Technical Solutions, LLC, Workforce Resources, LLC, ( Filing fee received: $ 400 receipt number 0974-12583670), filed by Lucy Nyirarwaka, Abdi Mwechiwa, Maymun Egal, Shukari Jama, Nyota Bokese, Abdinur Jama, Said Abiyow, Kerai Mberwa, Abdi Hussein, Mohammed Mohammed, Abdi Hagi Modowe, Lul Mohamed, Ananie Rugenza, Tegest Alemu, Abdi Omar Yusaf, Shabani Bokese, Mohamud H. Salad, Semir Desta Tesema, Fatuma Ibrahim, Abdullahi Warsame, Ali Hussein Shuriye, Hassan Omar, Mohamud Abdi Shure, Mohamed Osman Jama, Bare Mahamed Musse, Kashindi Alulu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01052-H-JLB. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Johnson, A)(als) Modified on 6/5/2019 to update fee information. (als).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abiyow et al v. Bristol Bay Native Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdullahi Warsame
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdinur Jama
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kashindi Alulu
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamud H. Salad
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Mohammed
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Osman Jama
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tegest Alemu
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamud Abdi Shure
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdi Hussein
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatuma Ibrahim
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyota Bokese
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Nyirarwaka
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdi Omar Yusaf
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lul Mohamed
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdi Hagi Modowe
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semir Desta Tesema
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdi Mwechiwa
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shukari Jama
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maymun Egal
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Hussein Shuriye
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ananie Rugenza
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bare Mahamed Musse
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan Omar
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Said Abiyow
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerai Mberwa
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shabani Bokese
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Bay Native Corporation
Represented By: Amy Todd-Gher
Represented By: Vani Parti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glacier Technical Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Amy Todd-Gher
Represented By: Vani Parti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workforce Resources, LLC
Represented By: Amy Todd-Gher
Represented By: Vani Parti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?