Derr v. RA Medical Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ervin Derr and Peter Shoemaker
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co., Nomura Securities International, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Ra Medical Systems, Inc., Martin Colombatto, Richard Heymann, Dean Irwin, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Maxim Group LLC, Maurice Buchbinder, Andrew Jackson, Richard Mejia, Jr., Martin Burstein, Melissa Burstein, Piper Sandler & Co., Mark E. Saad and William Enquist, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01079
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
2 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Ervin Derr, Peter Shoemaker . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ra Medical Announcement, #2 Exhibit 2 - San Diego Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Nevada Complaint)(Prongay, Robert) (jdt).
July 14, 2020 Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER. Currently on calendar for Monday, 7/20/2020 at 11:30 a.m. is a hearing on Defendants' motions to dismiss, Dkt. Nos. #29 and #30 . The Court finds these motions suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing on these motions is taken off calendar and these matters are taken under submission. That hearing is vacated. No appearances will be required in these matters on Monday, 7/20/2020. The RA Medical Defendants' Motion for Counsel to Appear via Videoconference, Dkt. No. #42 , is denied as moot. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/14/2020. (jdt)
July 13, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin F. Ruf on behalf of Ervin Derr, Peter Shoemaker (Ruf, Kevin)Attorney Kevin F. Ruf added to party Ervin Derr(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin F. Ruf added to party Peter Shoemaker(pty:pla) (jdt).
July 10, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Gregory L. Watts at in person for the July 20, 2020 Hearing, instead, appearing by Videoconference, by Maurice Buchbinder, Martin Colombatto, William Enquist, Jr, Richard Heymann, Andrew Jackson, Richard Mejia, Jr, RA Medical Systems, Inc., Mark E. Saad. (Watts, Gregory) (jmo).
June 25, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Maurice Buchbinder, Martin Colombatto, William Enquist, Jr, Richard Heymann, Andrew Jackson, Richard Mejia, Jr, RA Medical Systems, Inc., Mark E. Saad. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie L. Jensen)(Watts, Gregory) (jdt).
June 23, 2020 Filing 40 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Ervin Derr, Peter Shoemaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pavithra Rajesh, #2 Exhibit A - Surreply)(Prongay, Robert) (jdt).
May 27, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Martin Burstein, Melissa Burstein, Dean Irwin. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice)(Tencer, Philip) (jdt).
May 27, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY - Other re #31 Request for Judicial Notice, Reply in Further Support of their Request for Judicial Notice in Connection with its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Maurice Buchbinder, Martin Colombatto, William Enquist, Jr, Richard Heymann, Andrew Jackson, Richard Mejia, Jr, RA Medical Systems, Inc., Mark E. Saad. (Watts, Gregory) (jdt).
May 27, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim The Ra Medical Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Maurice Buchbinder, Martin Colombatto, William Enquist, Jr, Richard Heymann, Andrew Jackson, Richard Mejia, Jr, RA Medical Systems, Inc., Mark E. Saad. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie L. Jensen, #2 Exhibit Irwin Ex. T)(Watts, Gregory) (jdt).
April 27, 2020 Filing 36 OBJECTION by Ervin Derr, Peter Shoemaker re #31 Request for Judicial Notice, [29-2] Request for Judicial Notice (Prongay, Robert) (jdt).
April 27, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim The Ra Medical Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Ervin Derr, Peter Shoemaker. (Prongay, Robert) (jdt).
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Stephanie L. Jensen (Re: ECF No. #33 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/30/2020.(jrd)
March 25, 2020 Filing 33 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Jensen, Stephanie) (rmc).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Stephanie L. Jensen, re #27 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/12/2020.(rmc)
March 13, 2020 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Maurice Buchbinder, Martin Colombatto, William Enquist, Jr, Richard Heymann, Andrew Jackson, Richard Mejia, Jr, Ra Medical Systems, Inc., Mark E. Saad re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim The Ra Medical Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Watts, Gregory) (jdt).
March 13, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim The Ra Medical Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Maurice Buchbinder, Martin Colombatto, William Enquist, Jr, Richard Heymann, Andrew Jackson, Richard Mejia, Jr, Ra Medical Systems, Inc., Mark E. Saad. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie L. Jensen, #2 Exhibit 1 - 5)(Watts, Gregory) (jdt).
March 13, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Martin Burstein, Melissa Burstein, Dean Irwin. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V)(Mulvaney, Jessica)Attorney Jessica Mulvaney added to party Martin Burstein(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Mulvaney added to party Melissa Burstein(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Mulvaney added to party Dean Irwin(pty:dft) (jdt).
March 11, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ervin Derr, Peter Shoemaker as to Underwriter Defendants Piper Sandler & Co. f/k/a/ Piper Jaffray & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., and Maxim Group LLC (Rajesh, Pavithra) (jdt).
March 11, 2020 Filing 27 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Jensen, Stephanie) (rmc).
March 11, 2020 Filing 26 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13605818.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Jensen, Stephanie) QC mail sent on 3/11/2020 re missing signature; instructed to re-file but not re-pay (rmc).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits Regarding the Ra Medical Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Briefing (Dkt. #24 ). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/27/2020. (jdt)
February 26, 2020 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re the Ra Medical Defendants Motion to Dismiss Briefing by Maurice Buchbinder, Martin Colombatto, William Enquist, Jr, Richard Heymann, Andrew Jackson, Richard Mejia, Jr, Ra Medical Systems, Inc., Mark E. Saad. (Watts, Gregory)Attorney Gregory L. Watts added to party William Enquist, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L. Watts added to party Mark E. Saad(pty:dft) (jdt).
January 14, 2020 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jdt)
January 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Lodging by Ervin Derr re #21 First Amended Complaint, (Prongay, Robert) (jdt).
January 13, 2020 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Maurice Buchbinder, Martin Burstein, Melissa Burstein, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Martin Colombatto, Richard Heymann, Dean Irwin, Andrew Jackson, Maxim Group LLC, Richard Mejia, Jr., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., Ra Medical Systems, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Mark E. Saad, William Enquist, Jr., filed by Ervin Derr. New Summons Requested. (Prongay, Robert). Modified on 1/14/2020 to indicate first amending. (jdt).
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Party Name by Piper Jaffray & Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Colleen) (jdt).
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Philip C. Tencer is substituted as counsel for Gregory L. Watts as to Defendants Dean Irwin, Melissa Burstein and Martin Burstein. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/16/2019. (jdt)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Maxim Group LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Piper Jaffray Companies, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Piper Jaffray & Co.; Corporate Parent Nomura Holding America Inc., Corporate Parent Nomura Holdings, Inc for Nomura Securities International, Inc.; Corporate Parent SunTrust Banks, Inc. for SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.; Corporate Parent Maxim Partners LLC, Corporate Parent MJR Holdings, LLC for Maxim Group LLC.. (Johnson, Michele) (jdt).
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Maxim Group LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent SunTrust Banks, Inc. for SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.. (Johnson, Michele) (jdt).
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Carlton Smith on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Maxim Group LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. (Smith, Colleen)Attorney Colleen Carlton Smith added to party Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Colleen Carlton Smith added to party Maxim Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Colleen Carlton Smith added to party Nomura Securities International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Colleen Carlton Smith added to party Piper Jaffray & Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Colleen Carlton Smith added to party SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.(pty:dft) (jdt).
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele Dianne Johnson on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Maxim Group LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. (Johnson, Michele)Attorney Michele Dianne Johnson added to party Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Michele Dianne Johnson added to party Maxim Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michele Dianne Johnson added to party Nomura Securities International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michele Dianne Johnson added to party Piper Jaffray & Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Michele Dianne Johnson added to party SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.(pty:dft) (jdt).
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Martin Burstein, Melissa Burstein, Dean Irwin. (Tencer, Philip)Attorney Philip C Tencer added to party Martin Burstein(pty:dft), Attorney Philip C Tencer added to party Melissa Burstein(pty:dft), Attorney Philip C Tencer added to party Dean Irwin(pty:dft). Modified on 11/27/2019 - QC email: proposed order. No refile (jdt).
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ra Medical Systems, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Watts, Gregory) (jdt).
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory L. Watts on behalf of Maurice Buchbinder, Martin Burstein, Melissa Burstein, Martin Colombatto, Richard Heymann, Dean Irwin, Andrew Jackson, Richard Mejia, Jr, Ra Medical Systems, Inc. (Watts, Gregory)Attorney Gregory L. Watts added to party Maurice Buchbinder(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L. Watts added to party Martin Burstein(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L. Watts added to party Melissa Burstein(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L. Watts added to party Martin Colombatto(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L. Watts added to party Richard Heymann(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L. Watts added to party Dean Irwin(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L. Watts added to party Andrew Jackson(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L. Watts added to party Richard Mejia, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L. Watts added to party Ra Medical Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (jdt).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Set a Schedule for the Filing of an Amended Complaint and Anticipated Responsive Briefing (Dkt. #10 ). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/2/2019. (jdt)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION Setting Briefing Schedule by Ervin Derr, Peter Shoemaker. (Rajesh, Pavithra)Attorney Pavithra Rajesh added to party Ervin Derr(pty:pla), Attorney Pavithra Rajesh added to party Peter Shoemaker(pty:pla). Modified on 10/2/2019 - QC email: Attorneys who signed for all defendants need to file notices of appearance. No refile (jdt).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Motion to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff (Dkt. #4 ). The Court appoints Ervin Derr and Peter Shoemaker as Lead Plaintiff. The Court approves Ervin Derr and Peter Shoemaker's selection of Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP as Lead Counsel for the class. The hearing currently set for 10/7/2019 is vacated. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/4/2019. (jdt)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ervin Derr, as to Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Maxim Group LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Portnoy, Lesley) (jdt).
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel by Ervin Derr, Peter Shoemaker (Prongay, Robert)Attorney Robert Vincent Prongay added to party Ervin Derr(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Vincent Prongay added to party Peter Shoemaker(pty:mov) (jdt).
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ervin Derr, Peter Shoemaker, as to Maurice Buchbinder, Martin Burstein, Melissa Burstein, Martin Colombatto, Richard Heymann, Dean Irwin, Andrew Jackson, Richard Mejia, Jr, Ra Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Portnoy, Lesley) (jrm).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Order: Any opposition to Movants' motion must be filed no later 8/28/2019. Any reply must be filed no later than 9/4/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/13/2019. (jdt)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Ervin Derr, Peter Shoemaker. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support, #2 Declaration of Lesley F. Portnoy, #3 Exhibit A - Press Release, #4 Exhibit B - Certifications, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #6 Exhibit D - Firm Resume, #7 Proof of Service)(Portnoy, Lesley)Attorney Lesley F. Portnoy added to party Peter Shoemaker(pty:mov). Added MOTION for Order to Appoint Lead Plaintiff on 8/12/2019. Sent QC email reminder as to multipart motions (jdt).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Nita L. Stormes to the calendar of the Honorable Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. All pending dates including discovery deadlines, hearings, and conferences before Magistrate Judge Stormes, if any, remain unchanged until further order and are now set before Magistrate Allison H. Goddard. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 19cv1079-LAB-AHG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/8/2019.(jdt)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt) (jao).
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Maurice Buchbinder, Martin Burstein, Melissa Burstein, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Martin Colombatto, Richard Heymann, Dean Irwin, Andrew Jackson, Maxim Group LLC, Richard Mejia, Jr, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., Ra Medical Systems, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12597986). Filed by Ervin Derr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1079-LAB-NLS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Portnoy, Lesley)(sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derr v. RA Medical Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Derr
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Represented By: Kevin F. Ruf
Represented By: Pavithra Rajesh
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Shoemaker
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Represented By: Kevin F. Ruf
Represented By: Pavithra Rajesh
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co.
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Represented By: Michele Dianne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Represented By: Michele Dianne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Represented By: Michele Dianne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ra Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Jordana Morgan
Represented By: Stephanie L. Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Colombatto
Represented By: Natalie Jordana Morgan
Represented By: Stephanie L. Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Heymann
Represented By: Natalie Jordana Morgan
Represented By: Stephanie L. Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Irwin
Represented By: Philip C. Tencer
Represented By: Jessica Mulvaney
Represented By: Gregory L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Represented By: Michele Dianne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Group LLC
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Represented By: Michele Dianne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Buchbinder
Represented By: Natalie Jordana Morgan
Represented By: Stephanie L. Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Jackson
Represented By: Natalie Jordana Morgan
Represented By: Stephanie L. Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Mejia, Jr.
Represented By: Natalie Jordana Morgan
Represented By: Stephanie L. Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Burstein
Represented By: Philip C. Tencer
Represented By: Jessica Mulvaney
Represented By: Gregory L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Burstein
Represented By: Philip C. Tencer
Represented By: Jessica Mulvaney
Represented By: Gregory L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Sandler & Co.
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Represented By: Michele Dianne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Saad
Represented By: Natalie Jordana Morgan
Represented By: Stephanie L. Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Enquist, Jr.
Represented By: Natalie Jordana Morgan
Represented By: Stephanie L. Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?