Aguirre v. United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Aguirre
Defendant: United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission and DOES 1 to 10
Case Number: 3:2019cv01102
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
2 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
3 Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552fi
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas J. Whelan, Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-00495-BAS-BLM. The new case number is 3:19-cv-1102-BAS-BLM. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 6/19/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/17/2019.(jrm) (jao).
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Michael J. Aguirre of case(s) 19cv0495-BAS-BLM; 19cv0587-BAS-BLM . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Severson, Maria). Modified on 6/24/2019 - Proposed Low Number Transfer Order not prepared. Case already assigned to low number judge (jah).
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als) (jao). Modified on 6/13/2019 to include "amended" in docket text(als).
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1 to 10, United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12612751.), filed by Michael J. Aguirre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01102-W-MSB. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Severson, Maria)(als) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguirre v. United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Aguirre
Represented By: Maria C Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?