Garcia v. Seaworld Entertainment et al

Plaintiff: Martha Garcia
Defendant: Seaworld Parks & Entertainment - San Diego, DOES 1 to 100 and Seaworld Entertainment
Case Number: 3:2019cv01116
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Roger T Benitez
2 Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446pi
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Seaworld Parks & Entertainment - San Diego (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Marrero, Guillermo) (anh).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 7/16/2019. (jrm) (jao).
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference of August 5, 2019 by Seaworld Entertainment, Seaworld Parks & Entertainment - San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Marrero, Guillermo) (jrm).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/20/2019.(anh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19-cv-1116-CAB-LL.(no document attached) (anh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Seaworld Entertainment. (mme)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of CA, San Diego, case number 37-2019-00022297-CU-PO-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12620333.), filed by Seaworld Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - including State Court documents, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01116-BEN-LL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(mme) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/14/2019) to attach correct image (mme). (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Seaworld Entertainment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaworld Parks & Entertainment - San Diego
Represented By: Guillermo Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaworld Entertainment
Represented By: Guillermo Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Garcia
Represented By: Gary Lee Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?