Kellogg v. Wilson et al

Plaintiff: Kendrick Bangs Kellogg
Defendant: Christine Olsen's Papers, Patricia Crawford, DOES 1 through 100, US Department of Justice, Julie Wilson, Gwen Kissel, Janet Summerfield, Lance Williamson and Denise L Rubin
Case Number: 3:2019cv01121
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: Karen S Crawford
3 Judge: John A Houston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Christine Olsen's Papers, Patricia Crawford, Gwen Kissel, Denise L Rubin, Janet Summerfield, US Department of Justice, Lance Williamson, Julie Wilson, DOES 1 through 100 filed by Kendrick Bangs Kellogg. (jah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Filed as Notice) by Kendrick Bangs Kellogg. US Department of Justice served. (jah)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. Judge John A. Houston, Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:17-cv-01505-BAS-JLB. The new case number is 19CV1121-BAS(JLB).. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/19/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/18/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED SUMMONS Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (cdw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (cdw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Christine Olsen's Papers, Patricia Crawford, DOES 1 through 100, Gwen Kissel, Denise L Rubin, Janet Summerfield, US Department of Justice, Lance Williamson, Julie Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS112638), filed by Kendrick Bangs Kellogg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1121-JAH-KSC. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Kellogg, Kendrick)(cdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kellogg v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Olsen's Papers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Justice
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwen Kissel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Summerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise L Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Bangs Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?