Lewis et al v. Chase Airport Management Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Thomas J. Lewis and Leticia G. Lewis
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration, Chase Airport Management Inc. and County of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2019cv01152
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
2 Judge: William Q Hayes
3 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Objection to Plaintiffs Subpoena to Produce Documents [Chase Airport Management] filed by Leticia G. Lewis and Thomas J. Lewis. NUNC PRO TUNC 8/14/2019. (ag)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge William Q. Hayes Accepting Document: Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Objection to Plaintiffs Subpoena to Produce Documents [Chase Airport Management], from Plaintiffs Leticia G. Lewis, Thomas J. Lewis. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Date noticed for hearing not in compliance with rules/documents are not timely. Nunc Pro Tunc 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/14/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Objection to Plaintiffs Subpoena to Produce Documents [County of San Diego] filed by Leticia G. Lewis and Thomas J. Lewis. NUNC PRO TUNC 8/14/2019 (ag)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge William Q. Hayes Accepting Document: Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Objection to Plaintiffs Subpoena to Produce Documents [County of San Diego], from Plaintiffs Leticia G. Lewis and Thomas J. Lewis. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Date noticed for hearing not in compliance with rules/documents are not timely. Nunc Pro Tunc 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/14/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants filed by Leticia G. Lewis and Thomas J. Lewis. NUNC PRO TUNC 8/14/2019 (ag)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge William Q. Hayes Accepting Document: Plaintiffs Response to Defendants, from Plaintiffs Leticia G. Lewis, Thomas J. Lewis. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Date noticed for hearing not in compliance with rules/documents are not timely. Nunc Pro Tunc 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/14/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY - Other re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Federal Aviation Administration. (Dorgan, Glen) (ag).
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Strike filed by County of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(White, Timothy) (ag).
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Leticia G. Lewis and Thomas J. Lewis. NUNC PRO TUNC 7/24/2019 (ag)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge William Q. Hayes Accepting Document: Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, from Plaintiffs Leticia G. Lewis, Thomas J. Lewis. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 7.1 or 47.1 - Documents are not timely. Nunc Pro Tunc 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/29/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Request for Extension to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF No. #12 ) is granted. Any opposition by Plaintiffs to Defendant Chase Airport Management, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #4 ); Defendant FAA's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #6 ); and County of San Diego's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #9 ) shall be filed by 8/5/19. Any replies by Defendants shall be filed by 8/12/19. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (ag) Amended on 7/16/2019; Regenerated NEF; Amended entry served on non-registered users via U.S. Mail Service. (ajs).
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Ex Partie Extension to Respond to Defendants by Leticia G. Lewis and Thomas J. Lewis. NUNC PRO TUNC 7/5/2019 (ag)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge William Q. Hayes Accepting Document: Ex Partie Extension to Respond to Defendants, from Plaintiffs Leticia G. Lewis, Thomas J. Lewis. Non-compliance with local rule(s) OTHER: Civ.L Rule 5.1 Improper Format and Civ.L. Rule 7.1 or 47.1 - Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support. Nunc Pro Tunc 7/5/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/9/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: The oral argument set for 10/3/19 at 2:00 P.M. for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. #4 , #6 ) is VACATED. The briefing schedule for ECF Nos. #4 , #6 remains. The briefing schedule for Defendant County of San Diego's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #9 ) is as follows: Responses due by 7/22/19. Replies due by 7/29/19. Judge William Q. Hayes. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (ajs)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by County of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(White, Timothy)Attorney Timothy M. White added to party County of San Diego(pty:dft) (ag). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Strike on 6/27/2019 (ag).
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Battaglia: Setting Briefing Schedule re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint : Responses due by 7/10/2019; Replies due by 7/17/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 10/3/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Dorgan, Glen) (ag).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:18-cv-00843-WQH-NLS. The new case number is 19cv1152-WQH-NLS. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/25/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/22/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Responses due by 7/9/2019; Replies due by 7/16/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 10/3/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chase Airport Management Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Jeffery, Janine)Attorney Janine K Jeffery added to party Chase Airport Management Inc.(pty:dft)(acc).
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lodgment of State Court Record by Federal Aviation Administration (Attachments: #1 attachment, #2 Proof of Service)(Dorgan, Glen) (acc).
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Federal Aviation Administration of case(s) 18cv00843-WQH-NLS. (jmo) (jao).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00016853-CU-PO-CTL., Fee waived, filed by Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1152-AJB-MSB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(jmo) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Chase Airport Management Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Represented By: Glen Dorgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Airport Management Inc.
Represented By: Janine K Jeffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Represented By: Timothy M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia G. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?