Enalasys Corporation v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: Enalasys Corporation
Defendant: Brad Chapin, Nelson Baxley, ECS Alliance, LLC, Joseph Werner, Greennet IOT, LLC, DOES 1 though 10 inclusive, Greennet Registry, LLC, John P. Carrieri and James Eric Taylor
Case Number: 3:2019cv01153
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by James Eric Taylor re #9 Reply to Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Paper Copy of Web Page)(Sutherland, Lowell) (jdt).
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER. Currently on calendar for Monday, 8/12/2019 at 11:15 a.m. is a hearing on Defendant's motion to abstain or remand (Docket no. #6 ). The Court finds this motion suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing on this motion is taken off calendar and this matter is taken under submission. No appearances will be required in this matter on Monday, 8/12/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/6/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina Danielle Johnson on behalf of John P. Carrieri, Greennet Registry, LLC (Johnson, Sabrina)Attorney Sabrina Danielle Johnson added to party John P. Carrieri(pty:dft), Attorney Sabrina Danielle Johnson added to party Greennet Registry, LLC(pty:dft) (jdt).
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A Pettit on behalf of John P. Carrieri, Greennet Registry, LLC (Pettit, Douglas)Attorney Douglas A Pettit added to party John P. Carrieri(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A Pettit added to party Greennet Registry, LLC(pty:dft) (jdt).
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lowell F Sutherland on behalf of James Eric Taylor (Sutherland, Lowell). Modified on 8/5/2019 to add atty on behalf of defendant Greennet IOT, LLC (jdt).
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by James Eric Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Paper Copy of Web Page)(Sutherland, Lowell) (jdt).
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Enalasys Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael Jones, #3 Proof of Service)(Jones, Michael). Modified on 7/29/2019 to remove duplicative text (jdt).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Construing Joint Motion as Noticed Motion. Defendants filed a joint motion to remand this action (Dkt. #6 ). The Court construes this as a noticed motion, with a hearing set for 11:15 a.m. on 8/12/2019. Any party opposing the motion must file a written opposition as required under Civil Local Rule 7.1(e)(2). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/9/2019. (jdt)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by James Eric Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order of Judge Anderholt, #3 Exhibit Declaration of James Eric Taylor, #4 Exhibit Declaration of John Breeze, Esq., #5 Exhibit Declaration Joseph Werner, #6 Exhibit Declaration Brad Chapin)(Sutherland, Lowell). Modified on 7/9/2019 - Sent QC email to have attorneys file notices of appearance. No refile (jdt).
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by James Eric Taylor, re #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Change Venue by Enalasys Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Scott Miller, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Syver Norderhaug, #3 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Declaration of James Eric Taylor)(Sutherland, Lowell). Modified on 7/9/2019 - Sent QC email to have attorneys file notices of appearance. Wrong event selected. Changed event selection, edited docket text and terminated motion and judge association. No refile (jdt).
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION to Change Venue by Enalasys Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A - Prior Sua Sponte Order, #3 Declaration Exhibit B - Supporting Declaration of Michael Jones, #4 Proof of Service)(Jones, Michael)Attorney Michael Anthony Jones added to party Enalasys Corporation(pty:pla). Modified on 7/1/2019 to add "ex parte," remove duplicative docket text (jdt).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Move for Transfer. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by James Eric Taylor. (sxa) (jao).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of The State of California, case number ECU000691. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12634012.), filed by Enalasys Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Answer to Complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1153-LAB-JLB. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(sxa) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enalasys Corporation v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Chapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Baxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECS Alliance, LLC
Represented By: John W Breeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greennet IOT, LLC
Represented By: Lowell F Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 though 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greennet Registry, LLC
Represented By: Douglas A Pettit
Represented By: Sabrina Danielle Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Carrieri
Represented By: Douglas A Pettit
Represented By: Sabrina Danielle Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Eric Taylor
Represented By: Lowell F Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enalasys Corporation
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Buck
Represented By: Michael Anthony Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?