Tele-Physicians, P.C. et al v. Hailey
Plaintiff: Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C. and Tele-Physicians, P.C.
Defendant: Jennifer Hailey
Case Number: 3:2019cv01177
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicians, P.C. (Kalt, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Necessary and Indispensable Party : Responses due by 8/30/2019; Replies due by 9/6/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 9/19/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Necessary and Indispensable Party by Jennifer Hailey. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss, #2 Declaration Of Jennifer Hailey In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss, #3 Declaration Of James Pickens In Support Of Respondents Motion To Dismiss)(Pickens, James) (jrm).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying #5 Petitioner's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/17/2019. (acc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C. re #12 Reply to Response to Motion, (Kalt, Michael) (acc).
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Camic, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of James Camic, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of James Camic, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of James Camic, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of James Camic)(Kalt, Michael) (acc).
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James N. Pickens on behalf of Jennifer Hailey (Pickens, James )Attorney James N. Pickens added to party Jennifer Hailey(pty:dft) (acc).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Requiring Reply From Petitioners. The Court ORDERS Petitioners to file a reply regarding subject matter jurisdiction. The reply must be filed with the Court by 7/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The reply is limited to ten (10) pages. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/10/2019.(acc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue [Amended] filed by Jennifer Hailey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer Hailey In Support of Respondent's [Amended] Opposition to Petitioners' Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order)(Pickens, James ) (acc).
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Jennifer Hailey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer Hailey in Support of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioners' Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order)(Pickens, James ) (acc).
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hubert Kim on behalf of Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kim, Hubert)Attorney Hubert Kim added to party Specialist on Call Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Hubert Kim added to party Tele-Physicans, P.C.(pty:pla) (acc).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue :Any response will be due by noon on Monday, 7/8/2019. Replies will not be accepted. (no document attached) (sc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Kalt, #2 Declaration of James Camic, #3 Declaration William E. Wallace, #4 Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #5 Exhibit A to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #6 Exhibit B to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #7 Exhibit C to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #8 Exhibit D to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #9 Exhibit E to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #10 Exhibit F to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #11 Exhibit G to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #12 Exhibit H to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #13 Exhibit I to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #14 Exhibit J to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #15 Exhibit K to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #16 Exhibit L to Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #17 Proof of Service)(Kalt, Michael)(acc).
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tele-Physicans, P.C., Specialist on Call Inc., as to Jennifer Hailey. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kalt, Michael) (acc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND PETITION for an Order Compelling Arbitration and Staying Proceedings by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C. (no document attached)(sxa)(jrd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Specialist on Call Inc., Tele-Physicans, P.C. re 1 Motion to Compel Arbitration Award. (sxa)(jrd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest filed by Specialist on Call Inc. Tele-Physicans, P.C. re 1 Motion to Compel Arbitration Award. No Parties With Financial Interest. (sxa)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tele-Physicians, P.C. et al v. Hailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Specialist on Call Inc.
Represented By: Michael Saul Kalt
Represented By: Hubert Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tele-Physicans, P.C.
Represented By: Michael Saul Kalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tele-Physicians, P.C.
Represented By: Michael Saul Kalt
Represented By: Hubert Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Hailey
Represented By: James Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?