U.S Bank National Association v. Somo et al
Plaintiff: U.S Bank National Association
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive and Salem H. Somo
Case Number: 3:2019cv01197
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Ruben B Brooks
2 Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
3 Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Remand to Superior Court. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/24/19. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service & Certified copy sent to San Diego Superior Court)(dlg) (jao).
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand To Superior Court by U.S Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Coutts, Melissa) (dlg).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for all further proceedings. Judge Cynthia Bashant, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-00658-GPC-RBB. The new case number is 19cv1197-GPC-RBB. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/27/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by U.S Bank National Association of case(s) 19cv658-GPC-RBB. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Proof of Service)(Coutts, Melissa). Modified on 6/28/2019 - Proposed Low Number Order previously prepared and forwarded. QC Email sent file Corporate Disclosure separately (jah).
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Salem H. Somo re #1 Notice of Removal. No Parties With Financial Interest. (jxv)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Salem H. Somo. (jxv) Modified on 6/27/2019 (jxv).
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL From San Diego Superior Court- County of San Diego, case number 37-02018-00051776-CL-UD-CTL. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS113003.), filed by Salem H. Somo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Answer)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01197-BAS-JLB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(jxv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #4 Receipt) (jxv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S Bank National Association v. Somo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem H. Somo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S Bank National Association
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?