Solomon v. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Solomon
Defendant: First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company and Tiffany & Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01203
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/23/2019 at 9:30am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/14/2019.(jpp)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tiffany & Company. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Certificate)(Nadel, Darren)Attorney Darren E Nadel added to party Tiffany & Company(pty:dft) (jpp).
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv) (jao).
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, Tiffany & Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12663863.), filed by Stephen Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01203-JLS-BLM. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Bonnici, Joshua)(jxv) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany & Company
Represented By: Darren E Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Solomon
Represented By: Joshua Michael Bonnici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?