Crizer v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christine Marie Crizer
Defendant: FCA US LLC and DOES 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2019cv01244
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion for Dismissal. The Joint Motion for Dismissal is due: 10/9/2019. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 10/9/2019, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. The Settlement Disposition Conference is set for 10/15/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 8/9/2019. (tcf) (jao).
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and All Related Deadlines by Christine Marie Crizer (Scott, Christian) (anh).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/9/2019. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 7/9/2019.(jrm) (jao).
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FCA US LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., a publicly held company, Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, formerly known as Fiat North for FCA US LLC. (smd) (jao).
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US LLC. (smd) (jao).
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00028203-CU-BC-CTL filed by FCA US LLC, DOES 1 through 100 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12692888). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to Adverse Parties, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01244-BEN-LL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(smd) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crizer v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Marie Crizer
Represented By: Christian S Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Carlin Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?