Rivera v. San Diego Central Jail et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Rivera
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe, S.D. Sheriff, John Doe 2, Doe Jane or John and San Diego Central Jail
Case Number: 3:2019cv01259
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jorge Rivera. Order #3 sent to new address. (jms)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Mail sent to Jorge Rivera. (tcf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jorge Rivera (jms) Order #3 mailed to new address (jms).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a) and dismissing civil action and dismissing civil action without prejudice for failing to prepay filing fees required by 28 USC 1914(a). If Plaintiff neither pays the $400 filing fee in full nor sufficiently completes and files a renewed Motion to Proceed IFP together with a certified copy of his 6-month trust account statements within forty-five (45) days, this case will remain dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1914(a) and without any further Order of the Court. (Blank motion for IFP mailed to Plaintiff). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/31/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (jao).
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jorge Rivera. (jms) (dsn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jane Doe, John Doe, John Doe 2, Doe Jane or John, S.D. Sheriff, San Diego Central Jail, filed by Jorge Rivera.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1259-JLS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. San Diego Central Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.D. Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Jane or John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Central Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?