Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation v. Pelletier et al
Petitioner: Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation
Respondent: Richard Pelletier and Richard Pelletier Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01263
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0207
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel E. Gonzalez, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Daniel E. Gonzalez)(Turrill, Michael) (tcf).
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation re #14 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation . (Turrill, Michael) (tcf).
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #15 *** REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Petition (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel E. Gonzalez, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Daniel E. Gonzalez)(Turrill, Michael) QC mailer sent re: document not signed (tcf).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minute Order Taking Motion Under Submission: Respondent Richard Pelletier Holding, Inc.'s #9 MOTION to Dismiss Petition is currently set for hearing on September 16, 2019. The Court finds this matter suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and the hearing shall be taken off calendar. SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/11/19.(no document attached) (jgc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Petition filed by Richard Pelletier and Richard Pelletier Holdings Inc.. (Howard, John) (rmc). Modified on 9/10/2019 to correctly identify filing party (rmc).
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Petition filed by Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel E. Gonzalez)(Turrill, Michael) (rmc).
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Richard Pelletier.(Howard, John)Attorney John W Howard added to party Richard Pelletier(pty:res) QC mail sent re signature not matching filing attorney (rmc).
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Petition by Richard Pelletier Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Respondent's Memorandum or Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Petition, #2 Declaration Declaration of Richard Pelletier in Support of Motion to Dismiss Petition)(Howard, John) (rmc).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Respondents to Respond to 1 Petition. Upon due consideration, good cause appearing, the Court grants the joint motion. Respondents must respond to the Petition on or before 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/6/2019. (rmc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Award by Richard Pelletier Holdings Inc.. (Howard, John)Attorney John W Howard added to party Richard Pelletier Holdings Inc.(pty:res) (rmc).
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation. Richard Pelletier Holdings Inc. served. (Turrill, Michael) (rmc).
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation. Richard Pelletier served. (Turrill, Michael) (rmc).
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als) (jao).
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation identifying Corporate Parent MasTec Canadian Holdco ULC, Corporate Parent MasTec Cooperateif (UA) (NL), Corporate Parent MasTec North America, Inc. (FL), Corporate Parent MasTec Foreign Holdings, LLC (FL), Corporate Parent MasTec, Inc for Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation. (als) (jao).
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation re 1 Motion to Compel Arbitration Award. Identifying Other Affiliate MasTec Canadian Holdco ULC, Other Affiliate MasTec Cooperateif (UA) (NL), Other Affiliate MasTec North America, Inc. (FL), Other Affiliate MasTec Foreign Holdings, LLC (FL), Other Affiliate MasTec, Inc for Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation. (als)(jao).
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Award by Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation. (no document attached) (als) Modified on 7/9/2019 to update docket number and name of motion(als).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation v. Pelletier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pacer Construction Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Michael L. Turrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Pelletier
Represented By: John W Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Pelletier Holdings Inc.
Represented By: John W Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?