Davis v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Laura Davis
Defendant: Lowe's Corporation, Lowe's Oceanside Store, Daniel Doe, DOES 1 through 2-250, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC and Does 2-250
Case Number: 3:2019cv01284
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY - Other re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Plaintiff to Remand Case to State Court filed by Laura Davis. (Nichols, Andrea)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Roger Backlar's Declaration, #2 Declaration Wesley Lester's Declaration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Backlar, Roger) (sjm).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE"). The ENE set for 9/30/2019 at 2:30 p.m. is continued to 10/8/2019 at 2:30 p.m. Confidential briefs shall be lodged with Chambers one week prior to the ENE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/15/2019. (no document attached) (kxb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by Laura Davis. (Nichols, Andrea) (sjm).
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrea Mae Nichols (Nichols, Andrea) (sjm).
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Laura Davis. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court and for an Award of Costs and Attorney's Fees, #2 Declaration of Andrea M. Nichols In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court and for an Award of Costs and Attorney's Fees, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrea M. Nichols In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court and for an Award of Costs and Attorney's Fees, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Andrea M. Nichols In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court and for an Award of Costs and Attorney's Fees, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Andrea M. Nichols In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court and for an Award of Costs and Attorney's Fees)(Nichols, Andrea)Attorney Andrea Mae Nichols added to party Laura Davis(pty:pla) (sjm).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION CONFERENCE. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/26/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/16/2019.(sjm)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. Identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (sxa) (jao).
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (sxa) (jao).
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (sxa) (jao).
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of The State of California, case number 37-2018-00060428-CU-PO-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12710757.), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01284-JM-KSC. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(sxa) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Oceanside Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 2-250
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2-250
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Davis
Represented By: Guy Levy
Represented By: Andrea Mae Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?