(PC) Mansour v. CDCR
Plaintiff: Mustaffa A. Mansour
Defendant: CDCR
Case Number: 3:2019cv01325
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 Letters from Michael Albert Rondinelli by Mustaffa A. Mansour. Nunc Pro Tunc 8/1/2019.(jms)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Accepting Document: Letters from Michael Albert Rondinelli, from Plaintiff Mustaffa A. Mansour. Non-compliance with local rule(s), CivLR 5.1.h [N]o document may be filed in any case by any person not a party.Civ.L.Rule 83.9 Parties to an action must refrain from writing ex parte letters to the judge; OTHER: Case transferred in from EDCA on 7/16/19; Motion to Proceed IFP [ECF No. 5] pending; Complaint submitted for screening per 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and 1915A. Nunc Pro Tunc 8/1/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/2/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 Letter by Mustaffa A. Mansour. Nunc Pro Tunc 7/22/2019.(jms)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Accepting Document: Letter, from Plaintiff Mustaffa A. Mansour. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ.L.Rule 83.9 Parties to an action must refrain from writing ex parte letters to the judge, OTHER: Case transferred in from EDCA on 7/16/19; Motion to Proceed IFP [ECF No. 5] pending; Complaint submitted for screening per 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and 1915A. Nunc Pro Tunc 7/22/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/23/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez assigned to transfer case from Eastern District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jms) (jao).
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00961. Original file received electronically
July 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Mustaffa A. Mansour. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/15/2019 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Mustaffa A. Mansour re #4 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Mustaffa A. Mansour. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Mustaffa A. Mansour. (Coll, A) Modified on 6/21/2019 (Plummer, M). [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against CDCR by Mustaffa A. Mansour.(Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
May 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order along with ifp form, 1983 form and 2254 form served on Mustaffa A. Mansour. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/29/2019 ORDERING Mr. Mansour may file a civil rights complaint or a petition for writ of habeas corpus within 30 days. Mr. Mansour has 30 days to submit either the applicable fee or the application required by 1915(a). The Clerk shall send Mr. Mansour the court's ifp application form, the prisoner civil rights complaint form, and the court's 2254 habeas form. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
May 28, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Mustaffa A. Mansour. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 LETTER by Mustaffa A. Mansour. (York, M) Modified on 5/29/2019 (Yin, K). [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Mansour v. CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustaffa A. Mansour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?