Amgen Inc. et al v. Tanvex BioPharma USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amgen Manufacturing, Limited and Amgen Inc.
Defendant: Tanvex Biologics Corp., Tanvex Biopharma, Inc. and Tanvex BioPharma USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01374
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
2 Judge: Allison H Goddard
3 Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF JUDGE TRANSFER. This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Michael S. Berg to the calendar of the Honorable Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. All pending dates including discovery deadlines, hearings, and conferences before Magistrate Judge Berg, if any, remain unchanged until further order and are now set before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. The new case number is 19cv1374-H-AHG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 9/20/2019. (jah)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 PRO HAC APPROVED re #22 : Thomas H. Wintner appearing for Defendants Tanvex BioPharma USA, Inc., Tanvex Biologics Corp., Tanvex Biopharma, Inc. (no document attached) (mdc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 PRO HAC APPROVED re #20 : Joseph Rutkowski appearing for Defendants Tanvex BioPharma USA, Inc., Tanvex Biologics Corp., Tanvex Biopharma, Inc. (no document attached) (mdc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Eastham on behalf of Tanvex BioPharma USA, Inc., Tanvex Biologics Corp., Tanvex Biopharma, Inc. (Eastham, Eric)Attorney Eric J. Eastham added to party Tanvex BioPharma USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric J. Eastham added to party Tanvex Biologics Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric J. Eastham added to party Tanvex Biopharma, Inc.(pty:dft). Modified on 9/13/2019 - Captioned to wrong judge. QC Email sent re correct judge (jah).
September 12, 2019 Filing 22 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12933387 - See #21 .) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Wintner, Thomas) Modified text on 9/12/2019 to add filing fee info. (mdc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 *** REFILED AS #22 *** - Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12933387.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Rutkowski, Joseph) Modified text on 9/12/2019 to indicate refiled status. (mdc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12933360.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Rutkowski, Joseph) (mdc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. The new case number is 3:19-cv-01374-H-MSB.(no document attached) (jrm)
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited, as to Tanvex BioPharma USA, Inc., Tanvex Biologics Corp., Tanvex Biopharma, Inc.. (Janine-Page, Marisa) (jrm).
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 PRO HAC APPROVED re #11 : Aaron Joseph Marks appearing for Plaintiffs Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (no document attached) (mdc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 PRO HAC APPROVED re #10 : Jacob Tinsley Whitt appearing for Plaintiffs Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (no document attached) (mdc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 PRO HAC APPROVED re #9 : Naz Wehrli appearing for Plaintiffs Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (no document attached) (mdc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 PRO HAC APPROVED re #8 : Jennifer Gordon appearing for Plaintiffs Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (no document attached) (mdc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 PRO HAC APPROVED re #7 : Jennifer H. Wu appearing for Plaintiffs Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (no document attached) (mdc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 PRO HAC APPROVED re #6 : Nicholas Groombridge appearing for Plaintiffs Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (no document attached) (mdc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12761639.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Marks, Aaron) (mdc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12761617.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Whitt, Jacob) (mdc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12761595.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Wehrli, Naz) (mdc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12761540.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Gordon, Jennifer) (mdc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12761484.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Wu, Jennifer) (mdc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12761422.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Groombridge, Nicholas) (mdc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1374 BEN (MSB).(no document attached) (jcj)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *9,856,287 B2* cc:USPTO (jmo) (jao).
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/24/2019) (cdw). (jao).
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited identifying Corporate Parent Amgen Inc. for Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (jmo) (jao).
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tanvex BioPharma USA, Inc., Tanvex Biologics Corp., Tanvex Biopharma, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12752053), filed by Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01374-AJB-MSB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Janine-Page, Marisa)(jmo) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amgen Inc. et al v. Tanvex BioPharma USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanvex Biologics Corp.
Represented By: Thomas H. Wintner
Represented By: Joseph Rutkowski
Represented By: Eric J. Eastham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanvex Biopharma, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas H. Wintner
Represented By: Joseph Rutkowski
Represented By: Eric J. Eastham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanvex BioPharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas H. Wintner
Represented By: Joseph Rutkowski
Represented By: Eric J. Eastham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amgen Manufacturing, Limited
Represented By: Marisa Janine-Page
Represented By: Naz Wehrli
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Marks
Represented By: Jacob Tinsley Whitt
Represented By: Nicholas Groombridge
Represented By: Jennifer Gordon
Represented By: Jennifer H. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amgen Inc.
Represented By: Marisa Janine-Page
Represented By: Naz Wehrli
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Marks
Represented By: Jacob Tinsley Whitt
Represented By: Nicholas Groombridge
Represented By: Jennifer Gordon
Represented By: Jennifer H. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?