United States of America v. 2006 Honda CBR600RR Motorcycle
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2006 Honda CBR600RR Motorcycle
Case Number: 3:2019cv01379
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 19:1595a
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT for ARREST IN ACTION IN REM issued as to Defendant 2006 Honda CBR600RR Motorcycle (jpp)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER appointing Homeland Security Investigations as custodian (ECF No. #2 ). (cc: USM). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/30/2019. (jpp)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION to Appoint Homeland Security Investigations as Custodian by United States of America. (jmo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for forfeiture against 2006 Honda CBR600RR Motorcycle, No Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1379-JLS-BLM. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Rawls, David)(jmo) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/24/2019) (jmo). (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2006 Honda CBR600RR Motorcycle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2006 Honda CBR600RR Motorcycle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David Joseph Rawls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?