Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Sealfit, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Crossfit, Inc. and Sealfit, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01388
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference will be held in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on November 5, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 9/13/19.(dlg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Crossfit, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Osborne, Gary) (dlg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Crossfit, Inc..(Osborne, Gary)Attorney Gary Wayne Osborne added to party Crossfit, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Crossfit, Inc. served. (Darling-Alderton, Lisa) (dlg).
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Sealfit, Inc. served. (Darling-Alderton, Lisa) (dlg).
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company Identifying Other Affiliate Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Tokio Marine North America, Inc., Other Affiliate Tokio Marine and Nichido Fire Insurance Company for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (jmo)(jrd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crossfit, Inc., Sealfit, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12758946.), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01388-GPC-AGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Darling-Alderton, Lisa)(jmo) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Sealfit, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossfit, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Wayne Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealfit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa Marie Darling-Alderton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?