Ponce de Ramos et al v. Archambeault et al
Petitioner: A.H.G.F. 2, Jacqueline Ponce de Ramos, Astrid Fuentes Nolasco, Darvin Gonzalez-Godinez, S.V.R.P. and A.H.G.F. 1
Respondent: Matthew Albence, Sidney Aki, William Barr, Greg Archambeault and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01439
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Joint Motion to Dismiss action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/07/2019. (jpp) (jao).
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Sidney Aki, Matthew Albence, Greg Archambeault, William Barr, Darvin Gonzalez-Godinez, Kevin K. McAleenan. (Bettwy, Samuel)Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Sidney Aki(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Matthew Albence(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Greg Archambeault(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party William Barr(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Darvin Gonzalez-Godinez(pty:pet), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:res) (jms).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting in part #2 Emergency Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order; Setting Briefing Schedule and Ordering Preliminary Injunction Hearing. The Court Hereby Orders that Respondents Shall Not Return Petitioners to Mexico until after the Court holds a hearing as to whether a preliminary injunction should issue. Respondents shall file an opposition to Petitioners TRO Application on or before Monday, August 5, 2019. Petitioners may file a reply, if any, on or before Friday, August 9, 2019. The Parties are hereby Ordered to appear for a preliminary injunction hearing on Thursday, August 15, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4D. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/31/2019. (sjt)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jacqueline Ponce de Ramos, S.V.R.P., Darvin Gonzalez-Godinez, Astrid Fuentes Nolasco, A.H.G.F. 1, A.H.G.F. 2. (Pinheiro, Erika) Modified on 7/31/2019 to all petitioners in the docket text. (jrd). Modified on 7/31/2019 (sjt). (jms).
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Sidney Aki, Matthew Albence, Greg Archambeault, William Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan, filed by A.H.G.F. 2, S.V.R.P., Astrid Fuentes Nolasco, A.H.G.F. 1, Jacqueline Ponce de Ramos, Darvin Gonzalez-Godinez.(Filing fee $5 - receipt number: 0974-12780765) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Erika Pinheiro, #3 Ex Parte Declaration)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1439-JLS-KSC. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Pinheiro, Erika)(jms) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponce de Ramos et al v. Archambeault et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sidney Aki
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Archambeault
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A.H.G.F. 2
Represented By: Erika Da Cruz Pinheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacqueline Ponce de Ramos
Represented By: Erika Da Cruz Pinheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Astrid Fuentes Nolasco
Represented By: Erika Da Cruz Pinheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darvin Gonzalez-Godinez
Represented By: Erika Da Cruz Pinheiro
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: S.V.R.P.
Represented By: Erika Da Cruz Pinheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A.H.G.F. 1
Represented By: Erika Da Cruz Pinheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?