Holcomb v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Robert Eric Holcomb
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv01482
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:0982
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Robert Eric Holcomb. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. No later than 9/30/2019, Holcomb is ordered to file a declaration. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/20/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Dismissal by Robert Eric Holcomb. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Dismissal. No later than 9/18/2019, Holcomb is ordered to file a brief stating whether he, Brother's Keeper Ministries, or Camp Noble was served with a notice of summons, and if so, what date. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/6/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number CAS114653, Paid on 8/23/2019 (jrm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Robert Eric Holcomb. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Related Cases, Jurisdiction, and Failure to Pay Filing Fee. Order to Show Cause Brief due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/12/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Quash IRS Subpoena by Robert Eric Holcomb. (cdw) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/7/2019) (cdw).
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO QUASH IRS SUBPOENA against Internal Revenue Service (Filing Fee Due), filed by Robert Eric Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01482-LAB. Judge Larry Alan Burns is assigned to the case.(cdw) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/7/2019) (cdw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/7/2019) (cdw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holcomb v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Eric Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?