Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust et al v. My Electrician Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust, Jeremy Abrams, Andy Berg and Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Health & Welfare Trust
Defendant: My Electrician Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01500
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
2 Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation of your case will be held on December 16, 2019 at 9:30 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 9/24/19.(dlg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by My Electrician Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Info Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Luke)Attorney Luke Eric Thompson added to party My Electrician Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Transfer Order. Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1500-GPC-AHG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/17/19.(dlg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Health & Welfare Trust, Jeremy Abrams, Andy Berg. My Electrician Inc. served. (Do, Tino) (dlg).
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against My Electrician Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12817374), filed by Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Health & Welfare Trust, Jeremy Abrams, Andy Berg. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01500-GPC-MDD. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Do, Tino)(jmo) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust et al v. My Electrician Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Abrams
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Berg
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Health & Welfare Trust
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Electrician Inc.
Represented By: Luke Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?