Fernando v. Ulta Beauty, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tarini Fernando
Defendant: Ulta Beauty, Inc. and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2019cv01503
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
2 Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting Action With Prejudice [Doc. No. #23 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/12/2020. (anh)
February 12, 2020 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Action with Prejudice by Tarini Fernando. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Glick, Noam) (anh).
February 7, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER: A status conference is currently set for February 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4-C. Due to a conflict with the Courts calendar, the status conference is now rescheduled to February 13, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. (change of time only).(anh)
November 26, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez:Discovery Conference was held on 11/26/2019 to discuss the status of discovery. No order to issue. (no document attached) (asm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Roger R. Carter on behalf of Tarini Fernando (Carter, Roger)Attorney Roger R. Carter added to party Tarini Fernando(pty:pla) (anh).
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Noam Glick on behalf of Tarini Fernando (Glick, Noam)Attorney Noam Glick added to party Tarini Fernando(pty:pla) (anh).
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Tarini Fernando (Phelps, Marc) QC Email: Wrong CM/ECF account(anh).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Joint Motion for Protective Order Without Prejudice [ECF No. #16 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 10/28/2019. (anh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion Re: Stipulated Protective Order by Ulta Beauty, Inc.. (Sims, Lena) 1 (anh).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Following OSC Hearing and Setting Status Conference. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/11/2019.(anh)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo: Show Cause Hearing held on 10/10/2019. Status Conference to be set by the Court, Order to follow. (Court Reporter/ECR Mauralee Ramirez). (Plaintiff Attorney Noam Glick). (Defendant Attorney Lena K. Sims). (no document attached) (lmh)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/10/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4C before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/3/19.(sjm)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE As To How Claims Differ From The Claims In 18cv2480 Such That They Should Not Be Included In The 18cv2480 Settlement. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/1/2019.(anh)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 9/26/2019.(anh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 9/25/2019. The case did not settle. Case Management Conference held on 9/25/2019. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Marc Phelps, Noam Glick). (Defendant Attorney Lena Kae Sims). (Tarini Fernando, Naomi Katz).(no document attached) (fk1)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Tarini Fernando (Phelps, Marc) QC Email: Appearing attorney and cm/ecf user do not match(anh).
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Tarini Fernando (Phelps, Marc) (anh).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:18-cv-02480-CAB-LL. The new case number is 19cv1503-CAB-LL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/13/2019.(sjm)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference And Case Management Conference. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/16/2019. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 8/13/2019.(sjm)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Ulta Beauty, Inc. of case(s) CV 17-00853-DAD re #1 Notice of Removal,, . (Sims, Lena) (sjm).
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ulta Beauty, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Sims, Lena) (sjm).
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ulta Beauty, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Sims, Lena) (sjm).
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ulta Beauty, Inc.. (jxv)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court- County of San Diego, case number 37-02019-00034485-CU-OE-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12819430.), filed by Ulta Beauty, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Holly Morehouse, #3 Declaration of Lena K. Sims, #4 Exhibit A- State Court documents, #5 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01503-JM-LL. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(jxv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernando v. Ulta Beauty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulta Beauty, Inc.
Represented By: Lena Kae Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarini Fernando
Represented By: Marc Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?