N.B. v. Barr et al
Defendant: CoreCivic, LLC
Petitioner: N.B. and Hugo Ivan Salazar
Respondent: Dr. Stewart D. Smith, Oliver Castaneda, Mark A. Morgan, Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Fred Figueroa and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01536
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why (1) N.B.'s Petition should not be dismissed as moot, and (2) The Court's October 1, 2019 Order should not be vacated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/07/2019. (jpp).
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Oliver Castaneda, Fred Figueroa, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Stewart D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bettwy, Samuel) (jms).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (1) appointing Hugo Ivan Salazar as "next friend" to Minor Petitioner N.B. pursuant to 28 USC 2242 and (2) Preliminarily enjoining Respondents from further unlawfully detaining N.B... Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/01/2019. (jpp).
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Oliver Castaneda, Fred Figueroa, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Stewart D. Smith (French-English translations). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bettwy, Samuel) (jms).
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 TRAVERSE by N.B., re #5 Order to Show Cause filed by N.B.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hewlett, Douglas) (jms).
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scrivener's Error by N.B. re #7 Traverse (Hewlett, Douglas) (jms).
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 TRAVERSE by N.B., re #5 Order to Show Cause filed by N.B.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hewlett, Douglas) (jms).
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN TO PETITION by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Oliver Castaneda, Fred Figueroa, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Stewart D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bettwy, Samuel) (jms).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE pursuant to 28 USC 2243. Returns due by 8/22/2019. Traverse due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/2019.(jpp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #3 Application for Writ (and opposition to proposed order) filed by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Oliver Castaneda, Fred Figueroa, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A-File excerpts), #2 Exhibit)(Bettwy, Samuel) (jms).
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Writ of of Habeas Corpus or Order to Show Cause Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 by N.B.. (Hewlett, Douglas) (jms).
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel William Bettwy on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Oliver Castaneda, Fred Figueroa, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan (Bettwy, Samuel)Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Matthew T. Albence(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party William P. Barr(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Oliver Castaneda(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Fred Figueroa(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Mark A. Morgan(pty:res) (jms).
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Oliver Castaneda, CoreCivic, LLC, Fred Figueroa, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Stewart D. Smith , filed by N.B. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Filing fee $5, receipt number 0974-12835958.)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1536-JLS-LL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Hewlett, Douglas)(tcf)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.B. v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dr. Stewart D. Smith
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Oliver Castaneda
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark A. Morgan
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fred Figueroa
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic, LLC
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: N.B.
Represented By: Douglas Eugene Hewlett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hugo Ivan Salazar
Represented By: Douglas Eugene Hewlett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?