Miller et al v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, Patrick Russ, Ryan Peterson, James Miller, Wendy Hauffen, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., PWGG, L.P., John Phillips, California Gun Rights Foundation, Adrian Sevilla, Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Neil Rutherford and San Diego County Gun Owners PAC
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Martin Horan, Brent Orick, DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick and California Attorney General Xavier Becerra
Amicus Curiae: Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence and Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund
Case Number: 3:2019cv01537
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: John A Houston
3 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 MINUTE ORDER issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: In keeping with the Covid-19 related recommendations of United States President Donald J. Trump, as well as medical experts as to social distancing, this Court hereby exercises its discretion and vacates the current motion hearing date of March 19, 2020. Notice of a new motion hearing date and time will be given at a later date.(no document attached) (gxr)
February 4, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE: Change of Motion Hearing on #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certain Claims in First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief: Motion Hearing reset for 3/19/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
February 3, 2020 Filing 40 PRO HAC APPROVED: Erik Scott Jaffe appearing for Plaintiffs California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Wendy Hauffen, James Miller, PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, John Phillips, Neil Rutherford, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, Second Amendment Foundation, Adrian Sevilla (no document attached) (jrd)
February 3, 2020 Filing 39 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13439241.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Jaffe, Erik)(jrd)
January 30, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief filed by California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Wendy Hauffen, James Miller(an individual ), James Miller, PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, John Phillips, Neil Rutherford, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, Second Amendment Foundation, Adrian Sevilla. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robert A. Marguiles, M.D. In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Dillon, John) (mme).
January 30, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certain Claims in First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick. (Echeverria, John) (mme).
January 28, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter H. Chang on behalf of California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick (Chang, Peter)Attorney Peter H. Chang added to party California Attorney General Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Peter H. Chang added to party DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick(pty:dft) (mme).
January 24, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Amicus Brief, #3 Proposed Order)(Shearer, Hannah)Attorney Hannah Elizabeth Shearer added to party Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence(pty:am)
January 24, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Order for Leave to Participate as Amici Curiae by Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund. (Attachments: #1 Brief Of Amicus Curiae Everytown For Gun Safety Support Fund In Support Of Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #2 Appendix)(Sloan, Matthew)Attorney Matthew Eric Sloan added to party Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund(pty:am)
January 23, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief filed by California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lucy P. Allen, #2 Declaration of Christopher B. Colwell, M.D., #3 Declaration of John J. Donohue, #4 Declaration of Blake Graham, #5 Declaration of Louis Klarevas, #6 Declaration of John D. Echeverria, #7 Exhibit 1 to Echeverria Declaration, #8 Exhibit 2 to Echeverria Declaration, #9 Exhibit 3 to Echeverria Declaration, #10 Exhibit 4 to Echeverria Declaration, #11 Exhibit 5 to Echeverria Declaration, #12 Exhibit 6 to Echeverria Declaration, #13 Exhibit 7 to Echeverria Declaration, #14 Exhibit 8 to Echeverria Declaration, #15 Exhibit 9 to Echeverria Declaration, #16 Exhibit 10 to Echeverria Declaration, #17 Exhibit 11 to Echeverria Declaration, #18 Exhibit 12 to Echeverria Declaration, #19 Exhibit 13 to Echeverria Declaration, #20 Exhibit 14 to Echeverria Declaration, #21 Exhibit 15 to Echeverria Declaration, #22 Exhibit 16 to Echeverria Declaration, #23 Exhibit 17 to Echeverria Declaration, #24 Exhibit 18 to Echeverria Declaration, #25 Exhibit 19 to Echeverria Declaration, #26 Exhibit 20 to Echeverria Declaration, #27 Exhibit 21 to Echeverria Declaration, #28 Exhibit 22 to Echeverria Declaration, #29 Exhibit 23 to Echeverria Declaration, #30 Exhibit 24 to Echeverria Declaration, #31 Exhibit 25 to Echeverria Declaration, #32 Exhibit 26 to Echeverria Declaration)(Echeverria, John) (sjm).
January 15, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Motion Hearing as to [16-1] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certain Claims in First Amended Complaint, [16-2] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , [22-1] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief: Motion Hearing reset for 2/6/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Opposition briefs are to be filed no later than 1/23/2020. All reply briefs are to be filed no later than 1/30/2020. (no document attached) (gxr)
January 15, 2020 Filing 31 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: DENYING #25 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Related Appeals; DENYING #27 Ex Parte Motion to Stay re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certain Claims in First Amended Complaint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief Pending Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Stay. (no document attached) (gxr)
January 13, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Related Appeals filed by California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Wendy Hauffen, James Miller(an individual ), James Miller, PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, Ryan Peterson(an individual ), John Phillips, Patrick Russ(an individual ), Patrick Russ, Neil Rutherford, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, Second Amendment Foundation, Adrian Sevilla. (Lee, George) (mme).
December 23, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certain Claims in First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief< filed by California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Wendy Hauffen, James Miller(an individual ), James Miller, PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, Ryan Peterson(an individual ), John Phillips, Neil Rutherford, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, Second Amendment Foundation, Adrian Sevilla. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John W. Dillon in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Stay the Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #22 and Motion to Dismiss #16 Pending Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Stay #25 )(Dillon, John) (mme).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #26 Continuing Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing continued for 1/29/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Defendants opposition to the preliminary injunction motion is due by January 16, 2020, Plaintiffs reply in further support of the preliminary injunction motion is due by January 23, 2020, and Defendants reply in further support of the motion to dismiss is due by January 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/19/2019. (mme)
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certain Claims in First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief Pending Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Stay by California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Echeverria, John) (mme).
December 18, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss by California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick. (Echeverria, John) (mme).
December 13, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Related Appeals by California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Echeverria, John) (mme).
December 13, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Wendy Hauffen, James Miller(an individual ), James Miller, PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, Ryan Peterson(an individual ), John Phillips, Neil Rutherford, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, Second Amendment Foundation, Adrian Sevilla re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Ashley Hlebinsky in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration of James Miller in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Declaration of Wendy Hauffen in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Declaration of Ryan Peterson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Declaration of John Phillips in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Declaration of Neil Rutherford in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 Declaration of Adrian Sevilla in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #10 Declaration of John Lott in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Dillon, John) *QC Mailer sent re: no provision for acceptance* (mme).
December 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Hearing on #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certain Claims in First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing reset for 1/16/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief by California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Wendy Hauffen, James Miller(an individual ), James Miller, PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, Ryan Peterson(an individual ), John Phillips, Neil Rutherford, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, Second Amendment Foundation, Adrian Sevilla. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff James Miller in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff Wendy Hauffen in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff Neil Rutherford in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Declaration Declaration of Adrian Sevilla in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Declaration Declaration of Ryan Peterson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Declaration Declaration of John Phillips in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Declaration Declaration of Michael Schwartz in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 Declaration Declaration of Alan Gottlieb in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #10 Declaration Declaration of Gene Hoffman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #11 Declaration Declaration of Brandon Combs in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #12 Declaration Declaration of Emanuel Kapelsohn in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #13 Declaration Declaration of James Curcuruto in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #14 Declaration Declaration of Ashley Hlebinsky in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #15 Declaration Declaration of D. Allen Youngman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #16 Declaration Declaration of George Mocsary in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Part 1 of 2), #17 Declaration Declaration of George Mocsary in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Part 2 of 2), #18 Declaration Declaration of John Lott in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #19 Declaration Declaration of Adam Kraut in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Dillon, John) (mme).
December 4, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certain Claims in First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Wendy Hauffen, James Miller(an individual ), James Miller, PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, Ryan Peterson(an individual ), John Phillips, Neil Rutherford, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, Second Amendment Foundation, Adrian Sevilla. (Lee, George) (mme).
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Wendy Hauffen, James Miller, PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, John Phillips, Patrick Russ, Neil Rutherford, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, Second Amendment Foundation, Adrian Sevilla of Plaintiff Patrick Russ (Dillon, John) (tcf).
November 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Hearing on #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certain Claims in First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing reset for 12/18/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
November 20, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Granting #17 Joint Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages of Briefs Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (no document attached) (gxr)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Briefs Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Wendy Hauffen, James Miller(an individual ), James Miller, PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, Ryan Peterson(an individual ), John Phillips, Patrick Russ(an individual ), Patrick Russ, Neil Rutherford, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, Second Amendment Foundation, Adrian Sevilla. (Dillon, John) (mme).
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certain Claims in First Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Echeverria, John) (mme).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: #14 Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint. Xavier Becerra answer due 10/25/2019; Brent Orick answer due 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/10/2019. (mme) (jao).
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint, by California Attorney General Xavier Becerra, DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick. (Echeverria, John)Attorney John Darrow Echeverria added to party DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick(pty:dft) (mme).
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion/Stipulation #12 to Vacate the Case Management Conference and Rule 26 Compliance Dates is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2019 and all associated deadlines set forth in the Court's 9/12/2019 Order #8 are hereby VACATED. (cxe)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Stipulation and Request to Vacate Case Management Conference Hearing and Rule 26 Compliance Dates by California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Wendy Hauffen, James Miller(an individual ), James Miller, PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, Ryan Peterson(an individual ), John Phillips, Patrick Russ(an individual ), Patrick Russ, Neil Rutherford, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, Second Amendment Foundation, Adrian Sevilla (Dillon, John) (mme).
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint, and to Vacate CMC and Rule 26 Compliance Dates by California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Wendy Hauffen, James Miller(an individual ), James Miller, PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, Ryan Peterson(an individual ), John Phillips, Patrick Russ(an individual ), Patrick Russ, Neil Rutherford, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, Second Amendment Foundation, Adrian Sevilla (Lee, George)Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party California Gun Rights Foundation(pty:pla), Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party Gunfighter Tactical, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party Wendy Hauffen(pty:pla), Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party PWGG, L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party John Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party Neil Rutherford(pty:pla), Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party Second Amendment Foundation(pty:pla), Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party Adrian Sevilla(pty:pla) (tcf).
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Brent Orick, filed by Ryan Peterson, Patrick Russ, James Miller, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, Wendy Hauffen, Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation, John Phillips, Neil Rutherford, California Gun Rights Foundation, Adrian Sevilla, PWGG, L.P..New Summons Requested. (Dillon, John) (mme).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Joint Discovery Plan due 10/8/2019, Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2019. Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2019 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for May 12, 2020. Pretrial Conference before the District Judge assigned tothe case: September 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 09/12/2019.(mme)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Xavier Becerra, Martin Horan.(Echeverria, John)Attorney John Darrow Echeverria added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney John Darrow Echeverria added to party Martin Horan(pty:dft) (mme).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. Judge John A. Houston, Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:17-cv-01017-BEN-JLB. The new case number is 19-cv-1537-BEN-JLB. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/20/2019. (tcf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Miller, Ryan Peterson, Patrick Russ, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee re #4 Notice of Related Case (Dillon, John) (mme).
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by James Miller, Ryan Peterson, Patrick Russ, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee of case(s) 17-cv-1017-BEN-JLB . (Dillon, John) (tcf).
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by George Montgomery Lee on behalf of James Miller, Ryan Peterson, Patrick Russ, San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee (Lee, George)Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party James Miller(pty:pla), Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party Ryan Peterson(pty:pla), Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party Patrick Russ(pty:pla), Attorney George Montgomery Lee added to party San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee(pty:pla) (tcf).
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Martin Horan ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12835922.), filed by San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, James Miller, Ryan Peterson, Patrick Russ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01537-JAH-AGS. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Dillon, John)(jxv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: John Darrow Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Horan
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: John Darrow Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Orick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOJ Bureau of Firearms Director Brent Orick
Represented By: John Darrow Echeverria
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Attorney General Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: John Darrow Echeverria
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Russ
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Peterson
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Miller
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Hauffen
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PWGG, L.P.
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Phillips
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Gun Rights Foundation
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Sevilla
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gunfighter Tactical, LLC
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Rutherford
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego County Gun Owners PAC
Represented By: George Montgomery Lee
Represented By: John W. Dillon
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund
Represented By: Matthew Eric Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?