Raines v. Front Porch Communities and Services et al
Plaintiff: Kristina Raines
Defendant: Concentra Group Holdings LLC, Does 3 through 10, Select Medical Holdings Corporation, Front Porch Communities and Services and U.S. Healthworks Medical Group
Case Number: 3:2019cv01539
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: A Case Management Conference was held on 10/08/2019. A Settlement Conference is set for 11/6/2019 at 4:00 PM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. A telephonic attorneys-only Case Management Conference is set for 1/13/2020 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 5/4/2020 at 9:30 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 12/16/2020. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 1/8/2021. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Jury Trial is set for 2/16/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 10/09/2019.(ag)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held on 10/8/2019. The case did not settle. Case Management Conference was held on 10/8/2019. Scheduling order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorneys Randy S. Erlewine; Michael Miller; David Given). (Defendant Attorneys Marie B. Kenny; Jennifer L. Santa Maria). (no document attached) (dxm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron O'Brien Flynn on behalf of Concentra Group Holdings LLC, Select Medical Holdings Corporation, U.S. Healthworks Medical Group (Flynn, Cameron)Attorney Cameron O'Brien Flynn added to party Concentra Group Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cameron O'Brien Flynn added to party Select Medical Holdings Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Cameron O'Brien Flynn added to party U.S. Healthworks Medical Group(pty:dft) (aef).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference scheduled for October 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. are hereby RESET for 10:00 a.m. on the same day. All other guidelines and requirements remain as previously set. (See ECF No. 13.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 10/2/2019.(aef)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Kristina Raines (Erlewine, Randy) (aef).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 10/8/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 8/27/2019.(aef)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Front Porch Communities and Services . Identifying Corporate Parent Front Porch Communities and Services for Front Porch Communities and Services. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kenny, Marie) (aef).
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Conlon on behalf of Kristina Raines (Conlon, Brian)Attorney Brian S. Conlon added to party Kristina Raines(pty:pla) (aef).
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kristina Raines. (Erlewine, Randy) (aef).
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy Scott Erlewine on behalf of Kristina Raines (Erlewine, Randy)Attorney Randy Scott Erlewine added to party Kristina Raines(pty:pla) (aef).
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Joinder by Front Porch Communities and Services re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Kenny, Marie) (aef).
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Front Porch Communities and Services. (jxv)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Concentra Group Holdings, Select Medical Holdings Corporation, U.S. Healthworks Medical Group. Identifying Other Affiliate Lloyds of London, Other Affiliate Kristina Raines for Concentra Group Holdings, Select Medical Holdings Corporation, U.S. Healthworks Medical Group. (jxv)(sjt). (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/16/2019) (jxv).
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Concentra Group Holdings, Select Medical Holdings Corporation, U.S. Healthworks Medical Group identifying Corporate Parent Blackrock Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price for Select Medical Holdings Corporation.. (jxv) (sjt).
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Concentra Group Holdings, Select Medical Holdings Corporation, U.S. Healthworks Medical Group. (jxv)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 **Docketed in Error**
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by U.S. Healthworks Medical Group. (jxv)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego County- San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2018-00053708-CU-CR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12835960.), filed by Select Medical Holdings Corporation, Concentra Group Holdings, U.S. Healthworks Medical Group. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Jennifer L. Santa Maria in Support of Removal of Civil Action to, #3 Exhibit 1-8, #4 Exhibit A-D, #5 Exhibit 9-15) (jxv). (sjt). Modified to correct filing entry on 8/16/2019 (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raines v. Front Porch Communities and Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentra Group Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L. Santa Maria
Represented By: Cameron O'Brien Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 3 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Medical Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer L. Santa Maria
Represented By: Cameron O'Brien Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Front Porch Communities and Services
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Healthworks Medical Group
Represented By: Jennifer L. Santa Maria
Represented By: Cameron O'Brien Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Raines
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Brian S. Conlon
Represented By: Randy Scott Erlewine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?