Raub v. Synergy One Lending et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Raub
Defendant: Synergy One Lending, Inc. and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2019cv01543
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference will be held on 11/4/2019 at 9:30AM in the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Mitchell Dembin. The Joint Discovery Plan must be submitted to the Court in the same manner as ENE briefs no later than seven days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/30/2019.(rmc)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse C. Ferrantella on behalf of Synergy One Lending, Inc. (Ferrantella, Jesse)Attorney Jesse C. Ferrantella added to party Synergy One Lending, Inc.(pty:dft) (rmc).
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Johnson on behalf of Synergy One Lending, Inc. (Johnson, Timothy)Attorney Timothy L. Johnson added to party Synergy One Lending, Inc.(pty:dft) (rmc).
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Synergy One Lending, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, . Other Affiliate Michelle Raub, Corporate Parent Mutual of Omaha Bank for Synergy One Lending, Inc.. (Skeen, Spencer) Modified on 8/19/2019 to correct docket text to match document (rmc).
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Synergy One Lending. (jxv)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego County- San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-02019-00032335-CU-OE-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12839582.), filed by Synergy One Lending. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #5 Declaration of Jesse C. Ferrantella in Support of Defendant's Notice of Rem)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01543-MMA-MDD. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(jxv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raub v. Synergy One Lending et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Raub
Represented By: Douglas Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy One Lending, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer C Skeen
Represented By: Jesse C. Ferrantella
Represented By: Timothy L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?