George v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Joseph George
Defendant: United States, John Doe, Andrew Rodenstein and William Barr
Case Number: 3:2019cv01544
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331bv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting Document: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, from Plaintiff Joseph George. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/07/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) Modified docket text on 10/8/2019 (jrm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (jrm).
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court: 1. Grants Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) (Doc. No. #2 ); 2. Dismisses Plaintiff's Complaint as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) & 1915A and without leave to amend; 3. Denies Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. No. #5 ); 4. Denies Plaintiff's Motion for Joinder as moot (Doc. No. #7 ) 5. Certifies that an IFP appeal from this Order would also be frivolous and therefore, could not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3).(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) (sjt).
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order: 1) Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ); 2) Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel and Motion for Joinder (Doc. Nos. #5 , #7 ); and 3) Dismissing Civil Action as Frivolous Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(E)(2)(B). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/07/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies,,. Mail sent to Joseph George. (jms)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder by Joseph George. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/16/2019.(jms)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Accepting Document: Motion for Joinder, from Plaintiff Joseph George. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/16/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/17/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Joseph George. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/11/2019.(jms)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Accepting Document: Motion for Appointment of Counsel, from Plaintiff Joseph George. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/11/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/12/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph George (jms)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph George. (tcf) (jao).
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against William Barr, John Doe, John Doe, Andrew Rodenstein, United States, filed by Joseph George..($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1544-AJB-BLM. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Rodenstein
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?