Landa-Martinez v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Yailene Landa-Martinez
Respondent: William Barr, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement and Gregory J. Archambeault
Case Number: 3:2019cv01656
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Joint Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance and Stay Removal. The Court GRANTS the motion and ORDERS that this case will be held in abeyance and the Petitioner's removal stayed until a decision from the U.S. Supreme Court on the pending petition for certiorari in Thuraissigiam v. U.S. Dep't of Homeland Security, 917 F.3d 1097 (9th Cir. 2019), which is expected on October 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/7/2019. (aef)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay and Hold in Abeyance by Gregory J. Archambeault, William Barr, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline) (aef).
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY - Other re #3 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Petitioners Reply in Support of Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus and Emergency Temporary Restraining Order filed by Yailene Landa-Martinez. (Thompson, Rose) (jms).
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN TO PETITION by Gregory J. Archambeault, William Barr, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M)(Prime, Caroline) (jms).
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Clark Prime on behalf of Gregory J. Archambeault, William Barr, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement (Prime, Caroline)Attorney Caroline Clark Prime added to party Gregory J. Archambeault(pty:res), Attorney Caroline Clark Prime added to party William Barr(pty:res), Attorney Caroline Clark Prime added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:res), Attorney Caroline Clark Prime added to party U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:res) (jms).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requesting Response. The Government is ordered to file a response on or before September 13, 2019. Petitioner may file a reply to the Government's response on or before September 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/5/2019.(aef)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yailene Landa-Martinez re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, Exhibits 1-3, Civil Case Coversheet (Thompson, Rose) (jms).
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Gregory J. Archambeault, William Barr, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed by Yailene Landa-Martinez. (Filing fee $5 receipt number 0974-12892682.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Credible Fear Documents, #3 Exhibit 2 IJ Review Documents, #4 Exhibit 3 Call Log and TRAC Report)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1656-DMS-KSC. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Thompson, Rose)(tcf) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landa-Martinez v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yailene Landa-Martinez
Represented By: Rose Marie Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Caroline Clark Prime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Caroline Clark Prime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Caroline Clark Prime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory J. Archambeault
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Caroline Clark Prime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?