King v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust et al
Plaintiff: Pamela King and Pamela Schiavone
Defendant: Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Bank of America N.A., DOES 1 to 25, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP, a National Banking Association
Case Number: 3:2019cv01689
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Pamela King. (Lopez, Stephen) (anh).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Expunging Notice of Pendency of Action. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/15/2019.(anh)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Lodgment by Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust re #15 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Expunge, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Of Order Expunging Notice Of Pendency Of Action (Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Expunge Notice of Pendency of Action or Require a Bond [Doc. Nos. #3 , #5 , #9 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/11/2019. (anh)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION by Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion . (Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Expunge Notice of Pendency of Action Or Require A Bond filed by Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Expunge Notice of Pendency of Action Or Require A Bond filed by Pamela King. (Attachments: #1 Notice Request for Judicial Notice)(Lopez, Stephen) (anh).
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Pamela King. (Lopez, Stephen) (anh).
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank of America N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Stastny, Douglas)Attorney Douglas C. Stastny added to party Bank of America N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas C. Stastny added to party Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (anh).
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Bank of America N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation for Bank of America N.A.; Corporate Parent Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Maroon Holding, LLC. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Stastny, Douglas) (anh)(dsn)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust re #5 MOTION to Expunge Notice of Pendency of Action Or Require A Bond (Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Expunge Notice of Pendency of Action Or Require A Bond by Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration)(Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust re #1 Notice of Removal,, . Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust; Corporate Parent Caliber Home Loans, Inc. for Summit Management Company, LLC. (Goldstein, Aaron) (rmc).
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00035267-CU-OR-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12903906), filed by Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court summons and complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01689-CAB-WVG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(jmo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela King
Represented By: Stephen F. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Schiavone
Represented By: Stephen F. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Aaron R Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Aaron R Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Douglas C. Stastny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas C. Stastny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP, a National Banking Association
Represented By: Douglas C. Stastny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?