Hall v. Marriott International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Todd Hall, Jesse Heineken, Julie Drassinower, Kevin Branca, George Abdelsayed and Frank Ciglar
Defendant: Marriot International, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., . and Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01715
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
2 Judge: Jinsook Ohta
3 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). SDC set for 12/28/2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Joint email update due 12/26/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/20/2023.(hmw)
November 20, 2023 Filing 204 Joint Status Report Re: Mediation (Marron, Ronald) (exs).
October 16, 2023 Filing 203 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 10/4/2023, before Judge Jinsook Ohta. Court Reporter/Transcriber Abigail R. Torres. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2024. (maq)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Granting In Part #200 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, and Issuing AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. MSC is vacated. Email update due 11/20/2023. Motion hearing set for 1/31/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Jinsook Ohta. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/26/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Jinsook Ohta. Jury Trial set for 3/11/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Jinsook Ohta. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 10/4/2023. (hmw)
October 4, 2023 Filing 201 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jinsook Ohta: Status Conference held on 10/4/2023. Motion In Limine Hearing/Daubert Hearing set for 1/31/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4C before Judge Jinsook Ohta. Jury Trial set for 3/11/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4C before Judge Jinsook Ohta. (Court Reporter/ECR Abigail Torres). (Plaintiff Attorney Robert L. Teel; Lawrence Timothy Fisher). (Defendant Attorney Paul K. Leary; Chad Kurtz; Rachel Soloman). (no document attached) (smy)
October 3, 2023 Filing 200 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Order Deadlines (Taylor, Brett) (exs).
September 26, 2023 Filing 199 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Marriott International, Inc. of case(s) 3:23-cv-01764-WQH-MSB Filing Per Local Rule 40.1. (Taylor, Brett) (exs).
September 26, 2023 Filing 198 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Due to a conflict with counsel's schedule, the status conference set for 9/27/2023 is VACATED and is rescheduled for 10/4/2023 at 09:30 AM before the Honorable Jinsook Ohta. The parties are to appear by videoconference only. The courtroom deputy will provide counsel the videoconference information prior to the status conference. (no document attached) (smy)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Minute Order by Judge Jinsook Ohta: The Court schedules a status conference for Wednesday, September 27, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. to discuss trial dates in January 2024. The parties are to appear by videoconference only, and the courtroom deputy will provide the videoconference information prior to the hearing. Parties may contact chambers if they have a scheduling conflict with the September 27 date.Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 9/15/2023.(dsw)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Resetting Mandatory Settlement Conference ("MSC"). Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, MSC scheduled for 10/27/2023 is RESET for 11/3/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/24/2023.(hmw)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 195 SCHEDULING ORDER. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/27/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/7/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Jinsook Ohta. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 7/7/2023.(hmw)
July 7, 2023 Filing 194 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Case Management Conference held on 7/7/2023. Scheduling Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Lawrence Timothy Fisher). (Defendant Attorneys Chad Kurtz, Paul K. Leary Jr., and Deanna Clayton). (no document attached) (hmw)
July 6, 2023 Filing 193 Notice of Withdrawal of Attonrney Michael T. Houchin as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Houchin, Michael) (exs).
June 29, 2023 Filing 192 STATUS REPORT Joint Case Management Statement by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall. (Marron, Ronald) (rmc).
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Granting #190 Joint Motion to Continue Case Management Conference ("CMC"). CMC set for 6/22/2023 is RESET for 7/7/2023 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 6/12/2023. (hmw)
June 12, 2023 Filing 190 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paul K. Leary, Jr.)(Leary, Paul) (QC Mailer re: /s/) (exs).
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Setting Case Management Conference ("CMC"). CMC set for 6/22/2023 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Counsel for the parties must meet and confer in person, by phone, or by videoconference. Joint Case Management Statement must be filed by 6/20/2023. Confidential emails due 6/20/2023. Participant lists due via email 6/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 6/6/2023.(hmw)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Order on the Parties' Motions for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 6/6/2023. (exs)
April 26, 2023 Filing 187 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Strike Defendant's Unauthorized Reply Brief (Taylor, Brett) (exs).
April 26, 2023 Filing 186 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Strike Defendant's Unauthorized Reply Brief (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael T. Houchin)(Houchin, Michael) (exs).
April 26, 2023 Filing 185 Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Brett) (exs).
April 21, 2023 Filing 184 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration (Marron, Ronald) (exs).
April 21, 2023 Filing 183 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Taylor, Brett) (exs).
April 14, 2023 Filing 182 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration (Taylor, Brett) (exs).
April 13, 2023 Filing 181 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Marron, Ronald) (exs).
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part #140 #143 the Parties' Motions for Summary Judgment and Granting in Part and Denying in Part #144 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify the Class (exs). (exs).
March 24, 2023 Filing 179 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, to Appoint Class Representatives, and to Appoint Class Counsel (Marron, Ronald) (exs).
March 24, 2023 Filing 178 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Partially Redacted Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration Unredacted Declaration of Michael T. Houchin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 1- Partially Redacted, #4 Exhibit 2- Partially Redacted, #5 Exhibit 3- Partially Redacted, #6 Exhibit 5- Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 7- Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 8- Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 9- Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 10- Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 12- Unredacted, #12 Exhibit 13- Unredacted, #13 Exhibit 14- Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 15- Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 16- Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 17- Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 18- Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 19- Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 20- Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 24- Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 26- Unredacted, #22 Exhibit 27- Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 31- Unredacted)(Marron, Ronald) (exs).
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER on the parties' motions to seal: The Court is satisfied that the parties have met their burden to provide compelling reasons for the sealing of the information identified at Dockets 150 and 157. The Court is also satisfied that the partied have met their burden for the following documents identified at Docket 141: Exhibits 1-3 to the declaration of Michael T. Houchin, Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment, statement of disputed facts, and motion for class certification. Upon review of these documents, the Court finds that they reflect confidential and sensitive commercial information, the exposure of which could harm Marriott and third parties. The Court concludes that the parties have not met their burden with regard to the remainder of the documents identified at Docket 141. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Dockets 150 and 157 in full, and GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Docket 141. To the extent the Court has granted Plaintiffs' motion to seal at Docket 141, the redacted versions of these documents [Dkts. 146, Exs. A-F] shall be filed publicly on the docket. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 3/22/2023. (no document attached)
January 27, 2023 Filing 176 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief pursuant to Order Dated December 19, 2022 171 (Marron, Ronald) (exs).
January 27, 2023 Filing 175 Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief pursuant to the Order Dated December 7, 2022 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brett N. Taylor in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Brett) (exs).
January 16, 2023 Filing 174 Plaintiffs' Notice of Technical Failure (Marron, Ronald) (exs).
January 16, 2023 Filing 173 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief pursuant to Order Dated December 7, 2022 re #168 (Marron, Ronald) (exs).
January 13, 2023 Filing 172 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Marriott International, Inc. re #168 Order re Class Action Waiver Defense in Support of Opposition to Class Certification Motion. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brett N. Taylor in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief Regarding Class Action Waiver Defense in Support of Opposition to Class Certification Motion, #2 Exhibit A - F)(Taylor, Brett)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting [Dkt. 169] Defendant's motion for an extension of time to respond to the Court's request for supplemental briefing. The parties' supplemental briefing, not to exceed 15 pages, is due on or before January 13, 2023. The parties may submit responses, not to exceed 7 pages, on or before January 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 12/19/2022. (no document attached)
December 19, 2022 Filing 170 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Order Requesting Supplemental Briefing (Marron, Ronald) (exs).
December 16, 2022 Filing 169 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Order Requesting Supplemental Briefing (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Order Requesting Supplemental Briefing, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proof of Service re Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Order Requesting Supplemental Briefing)(Taylor, Brett) (exs).
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Order Requesting Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 12/6/2022.(exs)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order by Judge Jinsook Ohta: The attached civil chambers rules will take effect immediately. Parties should especially note the meet and confer requirements prior to obtaining a hearing date for a noticed motion. (smy)
October 11, 2022 Filing 166 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2022, before Judge Jinsook Ohta. Court Reporter/Transcriber Abigail R. Torres. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2023. (exs)
September 21, 2022 Filing 165 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jinsook Ohta: Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2022 re #144 MOTION to Certify Class , Appoint Class Representatives, and Appoint Class Counsel filed by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall, #143 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall, #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marriott International, Inc. The Court submits the motions and will issue a written decision. (Court Reporter/ECR Abigail Torres). (Plaintiff Attorney Michael Houchin; Lilach Halperin; Sean L. Litteral). (Defendant Attorney Paul K. Leary). (no document attached) (smy)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Resolving #126 Joint Motion For Determination of Discovery Dispute and Denying Defendant's Motion for Leave to Depose Kevin Branca. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/29/2022. (hmw)
August 5, 2022 Filing 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re #143 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald A. Marron in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Marron, Ronald) (axc).
August 5, 2022 Filing 162 REPLY to Response to Motion re #144 MOTION to Certify Class , Appoint Class Representatives, and Appoint Class Counsel filed by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Marron in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Marron, Ronald) (axc).
August 1, 2022 Filing 161 REPLY - Other re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Taylor, Brett) (axc).
August 1, 2022 Filing 160 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Marriott International, Inc. re #159 Reply - Other, filed by Marriott International, Inc. . (Leary, Paul) (axc).
July 29, 2022 Filing 159 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #160 *** REPLY - Other re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Leary, Paul) QC mailer re entry was filed using the CM/ECF account of an attorney other than the individual who signed the document(s). (axc). Modified on 8/1/2022 (axc).
July 29, 2022 Filing 158 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #157 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Leary, Paul)
July 29, 2022 Filing 157 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Leary, Paul)
July 15, 2022 Filing 156 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #141 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Taylor, Brett)
July 15, 2022 Filing 155 RESPONSE in Opposition re #143 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration Of Brett N. Taylor in Support of Marriott International, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Taylor Decl. Exhs. A - J)(Taylor, Brett) (axc).
July 15, 2022 Filing 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION to Certify Class , Appoint Class Representatives, and Appoint Class Counsel Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, to Appoint Class Representatives, and to Appoint Class Counsel filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theresa Coetzee in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, to Appoint Class Representatives, and to Appoint Class Counsel, #2 Exhibit Coetzee Decl. - Exhs. A - H, #3 Declaration of Brett N. Taylor in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, to Appoint Class Representatives, and to Appoint Class Counsel, #4 Exhibit Taylor Decl. - Exhs. A - K)(Taylor, Brett) (axc).
July 8, 2022 Filing 153 RESPONSE in Opposition re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald A. Marron, #2 Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Request for Judicial Notice, #23 Evidentiary Objections)(Marron, Ronald) (axc).
July 8, 2022 Filing 152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall re #151 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Houchin, Michael) (axc).
July 8, 2022 Filing 151 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #150 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Houchin, Michael) (anh).
July 8, 2022 Filing 150 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Houchin, Michael) (anh).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Joint Motion to Amend the deadlines for the parties to file oppositions and replies to motions for summary judgment and class certification. Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by July 8, 2022; Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment is due by July 15, 2022; Defendant's opposition to class certification is due by July 15, 2022; Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment is due by July 29, 2022; Plaintiffs' reply in support of its motion for partial summary judgment is due by August 5, 2022; Plaintiffs' reply in support of class certification is due by August 5, 2022. The hearing dates on the motions for summary judgment and class certification are rescheduled from July 27, 2022 to September 21, 2022 at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 5/12/2022. (no document attached) (lnb)
May 11, 2022 Filing 148 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing and Hearing Schedules by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall. (Houchin, Michael) (axc).
May 6, 2022 Filing 147 REPLY to Response to Motion re #141 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael T. Houchin, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Houchin, Michael) (axc).
April 29, 2022 Filing 146 RESPONSE to Motion re #141 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Unopposed Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Sealing Certain Documents Filed by Plaintiff filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theresa A. Coetzee in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Unopposed Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Sealing Certain Documents Filed by Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit A - F)(Taylor, Brett) (axc).
April 15, 2022 Filing 145 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall re #141 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, #142 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Halperin, Lilach) (axc).
April 15, 2022 Filing 144 MOTION to Certify Class , Appoint Class Representatives, and Appoint Class Counsel by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Declaration of Todd Hall in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Declaration of George Abdelsayed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Declaration of Ronald A. Marron in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Declaration of Robert Teel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #9 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F, #13 Declaration of James Prutsman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Marron, Ronald)(axc).
April 15, 2022 Filing 143 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Michael T. Houchin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Table of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Statement of Facts Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #36 Request for Judicial Notice)(Houchin, Michael) (axc).
April 15, 2022 Filing 142 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #141 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Houchin, Michael)
April 15, 2022 Filing 141 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Houchin, Michael)
April 8, 2022 Filing 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Marriott International, Inc., #2 Appendix Compendium of Evidence in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration of Brett N. Taylor in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Declaration of Theresa Coetzee in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit A - R, #6 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment)(Taylor, Brett) (axc).
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal re #124 , #131 . Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 4/8/2022. (axc)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #137 Joint Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and Set a Briefing Schedule for Motions for Summary Judgment. The Parties' Motions for Summary Judgment are due on April 15, 2022, and shall not exceed thirty (30) pages in length; the Parties' Oppositions to Summary Judgment are due thirty-five (35) days after the filing of the Motions for Summary Judgment and shall not exceed thirty (30) pages in length; the Parties' Replies are due fifty-six (56) days after the filing of the Motions for Summary Judgment and shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages in length. The hearing date on the Motions for Summary Judgment is set for July 27, 2022 at 9:30 am.. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 4/4/2022. (no document attached) (lnb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 137 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Exceed Page Limits and to Set a Briefing Schedule Regarding Parties' Forthcoming Motions for Summary Judgment by Marriott International, Inc.. (Taylor, Brett) (axc).
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #135 Joint Motion to Exceed Page Limits and Set a Briefing Schedule for Class Certification. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification due on April 15, 2022 shall not exceed thirty (30) pages in length; Defendant's Opposition to Class Certification is due on May 20, 2022 and shall not exceed thirty (30) pages in length; Plaintiffs' Reply is due on June 17, 2022 and shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages in length. The hearing date on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification is set for July 27, 2022 at 9:30 am. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 3/29/2022. (no document attached) (lnb)
March 16, 2022 Filing 135 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and to Set Briefing Schedule Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by George Abdelsayed, Todd Hall. (Marron, Ronald) QC-Mailer re entry was filed using the CM/ECF account of an attorney other than the individual who signed the document(axc).
March 1, 2022 Filing 134 REPLY to Response to Motion re #131 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff Kevin Branca's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff Kevin Branca's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Brett) (axc).
February 28, 2022 Filing 133 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Bryan L. Mosca as Counsel for Marriott International, Inc. by Marriott International, Inc. (Taylor, Brett) (axc).
February 25, 2022 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re #131 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff Kevin Branca's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Kevin Branca. (Marron, Ronald) (axc).
February 24, 2022 Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff Kevin Branca's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff Kevin Branca's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, #2 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Brett) (axc).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Minute Order by Judge Jinsook Ohta: The Court, pursuant to its discretion under Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), determines that the motion to dismiss (Doc. No. #124 ) is fit for resolution without oral argument and submits the motion on the parties' papers. Accordingly, the hearing on the motion to dismiss scheduled for February 23, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. is vacated. (no document attached) (smy)
February 16, 2022 Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re #124 MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff Kevin Branca's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) filed by Kevin Branca. (Marron, Ronald) (axc).
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 SIXTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/10/2022.(hmw)
February 9, 2022 Filing 127 RESPONSE to Motion re #124 MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff Kevin Branca's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) Defendant's Response to Plaintiff Kevin Branca's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, and Cross-Motion for Prevailing-Party Costs Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d) filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through F)(Taylor, Brett) (axc).
February 1, 2022 Filing 126 Joint MOTION for Discovery for Determination of Discovery Dispute Relating to Second Deposition of Plaintiff Kevin Branca by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through K)(Taylor, Brett) (axc).
January 27, 2022 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on November 6, 2020 by Marriott International, Inc.. (Taylor, Brett) (axc).
January 25, 2022 Filing 124 MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff Kevin Branca's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) by Kevin Branca. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Marron, Ronald) (dlg).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 1/10/2022.(hmw)
January 10, 2022 Filing 122 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Discovery Conference held on 1/10/2022. At the conference, the Court discussed the parties' disputes about certain Rule 30(b)(6) deposition topics, upcoming depositions of Erika Alexander and Shirley Coghill, certain interrogatories, and the request for a second deposition of Kevin Branca. The Court gave the parties guidance regarding their disputes. The Court extended the deadline for the parties to conduct depositions of Erika Alexander and Shirley Coghill. Regarding the dispute about a second deposition of Kevin Branca, the Court finds it appropriate to issue a briefing schedule. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorneys Lilach Halperin, Michael Houchin, Sean L. Litteral, and Lawrence Timothy Fisher). (Defendant Attorneys Paul K. Leary Jr. and Chad Kurtz). (no document attached) (hmw)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Setting Discovery Conference. Discovery videoconference set for 1/10/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 1/7/2022.(hmw)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER OF TRANSFER: This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Janis L. Sammartino to the calendar of the Honorable Jinsook Ohta. All dates currently set before Judge Sammartino are vacated and will be reset by Judge Ohta. Dates before the Magistrate Judge are unaffected by this Order. The new case number is 19cv1715 JO (AHG). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 01/04/2022.(jcj)
December 15, 2021 Filing 119 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 12/15/2021: The Court appeared at the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition at the request of Plaintiff. The Court gave guidance to both parties regarding their objections. (Plaintiff Attorney Sean L. Litteral). (Defendant Attorneys Paul K. Leary Jr. and Theresa Coetzee). (no document attached) (hmw)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting #117 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, and Issuing FIFTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. No further extensions will be permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/29/2021. (hmw)
November 24, 2021 Filing 117 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #115 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, the Court's October 19, 2021 Scheduling Order by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz)(Taylor, Brett) (tcf).
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Overruling Defendant's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order Resolving Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute [ECF No. #107 ]. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/1/2021. (tcf)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting #114 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, and Issuing FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 10/19/2021. (hmw) (Main Document 115 replaced on 10/19/2021 and NEF regenerated per chambers) (jmo).
October 19, 2021 Filing 114 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #110 Order on Motion to Continue The Court's September 7, 2021 Scheduling Order by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz)(Taylor, Brett) (tcf).
October 18, 2021 Filing 113 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Amy B. Alderfer as Counsel for Marriott International, Inc. by Marriott International, Inc. (Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
September 16, 2021 Filing 112 REPLY in Support re #107 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Marriott International, Inc., re #106 Order on Motion for Discovery filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
September 9, 2021 Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re #107 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Marriott International, Inc., re #106 Order on Motion for Discovery filed by Kevin Branca. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marron, Ronald) QC mailer sent, Proposed orders should not be attached. (zda).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting #109 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, and Issuing THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 9/7/2021. (hmw)
September 3, 2021 Filing 109 Joint MOTION to Continue July 8, 2021 Scheduling Order Deadlines by George Abdelsayed, Kevin Branca, Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael T. Houchin)(Houchin, Michael) (tcf).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Accepting Defendant's Procedurally Improper Objection and Setting Briefing Schedule for Same #107 . Plaintiffs opposition to Defendants Objection on or before September 9, 2021. Defendant may file a reply in support of its Objection, if any, on or before September 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/20/21.(dlg)
August 19, 2021 Filing 107 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Marriott International, Inc., re #106 Order on Motion for Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Alderfer, Amy) (ag).
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Resolving #101 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute and Denying Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/5/2021. (hmw)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting #104 Fourth Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Defendant to Produce Certain Documents pursuant to the Court's May 12 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/2/2021. (hmw)
July 30, 2021 Filing 104 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Fourth) by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz)(Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting #102 Third Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Certain Documents Pursuant to the Court's May 12, 2021 Order. Defendant shall complete its production pursuant to the Court's May 12 Order (ECF No. #80 ), with regard to resort fee and other fee revenue data that Marriott must obtain from managed or franchised hotels, by August 6, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 7/20/2021. (tcf)
July 16, 2021 Filing 102 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (To Produce Certain Documents Pursuant to May 12, 2021 Order) by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz)(Alderfer, Amy)(jmr).
July 15, 2021 Filing 101 Joint MOTION for Discovery (for Determination of the Discovery Dispute) by Marriott International, Inc. (Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
July 8, 2021 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean L. Litteral on behalf of George Abdelsayed, Kevin Branca, Todd Hall (Litteral, Sean)Attorney Sean L. Litteral added to party George Abdelsayed(pty:pla), Attorney Sean L. Litteral added to party Kevin Branca(pty:pla), Attorney Sean L. Litteral added to party Todd Hall(pty:pla) (tcf).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting #97 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, and Issuing SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 7/8/2021. (hmw)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting #96 Second Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Defendant to Produce Certain Documents pursuant to the Court's May 12 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 7/7/2021. (hmw)
July 7, 2021 Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Continue May 12, 2021 Scheduling Order Deadlines by George Abdelsayed, Kevin Branca, Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael T. Houchin)(Houchin, Michael) (tcf).
July 6, 2021 Filing 96 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (To Produce Certain Documents Pursuant to May 12, 2021 Order) by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz)(Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 6/30/2021.(hmw)
June 30, 2021 Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Telephonic Discovery Conference, regarding production of documents relating to other tickets purchased by Plaintiff Branca, held on 6/30/2021. The Court will set a briefing schedule by separate order. (Plaintiff Attorney Lilach Halperin). (Defendant Attorneys Chad Kurtz and Paul K. Leary Jr.). (no document attached) (hmw)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Setting Discovery Conference. Telephonic discovery conference set for 6/30/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 6/24/2021.(hmw)
June 24, 2021 Filing 92 ANSWER to #82 Amended Complaint (Third) Amended Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Marriott International, Inc. (Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting #89 Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to for Marriott to Respond to the Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint. Defendant SHALL RESPOND to the Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint on or before 6/24/2021. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/14/2021. (tcf)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting #88 Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Defendant to Produce Certain Documents pursuant to the Court's May 12 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 6/10/2021. (hmw)
June 10, 2021 Filing 89 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #82 Amended Complaint (Third Amended Class Action) by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz)(Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
June 8, 2021 Filing 88 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Produce Documents Pursuant to the Court's May 12, 2021 Order by Marriott International, Inc.. (Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting #86 Joint Motion for Order Regarding Production of Personally Identifiable Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 6/8/2021. (hmw)
June 4, 2021 Filing 86 Joint MOTION for an Order Regarding Production of Personally Identifiable Information by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting #84 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Raise Discovery Disputes with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 6/3/2021. (hmw)
June 3, 2021 Filing 84 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline to Raise Discovery Disputes by George Abdelsayed, Kevin Branca, Todd Hall. (Houchin, Michael)Attorney Michael Houchin added to party George Abdelsayed(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Houchin added to party Kevin Branca(pty:pla) (tcf).
June 2, 2021 Filing 83 DECLARATION re #80 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, by Defendant Marriott International, Inc. (Leary, Paul) QC mailer sent re: wrong Judge initials in caption (tcf).
May 27, 2021 Filing 82 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Marriott International, Inc., filed by Todd Hall, Kevin Branca, George Abdelsayed. (Marron, Ronald) (tcf).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; (2) Granting Defendant's Motion to File Documents Under Seal; and (3)Issuing Amended Scheduling Order [Ecf Nos. #57 , #61 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 5/12/2021. (anh)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER. Upon notification that Defendant has declined to move forward with its motion to compel in light of the Court's guidance during the telephonic discovery conference, the Court VACATES its #77 briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 5/4/2021.(no document attached) (hmw)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel (ECF No. #72 ). Cases Consolidated, Member case 21-cv-00402-JLS-AHG. All future docketing will be done in the lead case. Plaintiffs SHALL FILE a Consolidated Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date on which this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/27/2021. (tcf)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re: Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 4/21/2021.(hmw)
April 21, 2021 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 4/21/2021. The Court gave the parties its guidance and ordered them to further meet and confer. (Plaintiff Attorney Michael Houchin). (Defendant Attorneys Paul K. Leary Jr. and Chad Kurtz). (no document attached) (hmw)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Setting Discovery Conference. Telephonic conference set for 4/21/2021 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 4/19/2021.(hmw)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Taking Matter Under Submission without Oral Argument re #72 Motion to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. The Court finds the matter suitable for decision without oral argument; accordingly, the Court TAKES UNDER SUBMISSION the Motion without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/16/2021. (tcf)
April 8, 2021 Filing 73 NON Opposition re #72 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
March 23, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel by Kevin Branca, Julie Drassinower, Todd Hall, Jesse Heineken. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Ronald A. Marron, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Declaration of Robert L. Teel, #6 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C)(Marron, Ronald) (tcf).
March 16, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Kevin Branca, Julie Drassinower, Todd Hall, Jesse Heineken of case(s) 3:21-cv-00402-BEN-JLB . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Marron, Ronald) (tcf).
March 12, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Change of Address by Amy B Alderfer (Alderfer, Amy) QC mailer sent re: attorney's contact information needs to be updated in Pacer (tcf).
February 26, 2021 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2021 re #57 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Written Order to issue. (ECR Liberty Court Recorder, 9:35-10:45). (Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Michael Houchin and Lilach Halperin). (Defendant's Attorneys: Chad Kurtz and Paul K. Leary Jr.). (no document attached) (hmw)
February 19, 2021 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #57 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Discovery Responses filed by Todd Hall. (Houchin, Michael) (tcf).
February 16, 2021 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marriott International, Inc. re #62 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #61 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal // Proof of Service (Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
February 16, 2021 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marriott International, Inc. re #62 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #61 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal // Proof of Service (Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
February 16, 2021 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Discovery Responses // Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintif's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #7 Exhibit F to thE to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responsese Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #8 Declaration of Jennifer Aronson in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses (Redacted), #9 Proof of Service)(Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
February 16, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Marriott International, Inc. re #63 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Marriott International, Inc. . (Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
February 12, 2021 Filing 63 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #64 *** RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Discovery Responses // Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintif's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #7 Exhibit F to thE to the Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responsese Declaration of Chad E. Kurtz in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.;s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #8 Declaration of Jennifer Aronson in Support of Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses (Redacted))(Kurtz, Chad) QC mailer sent re: attorney's signature does not match CM/ECF account (tcf). Modified to withdraw on 2/16/2021 (tcf).
February 12, 2021 Filing 62 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #61 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Kurtz, Chad) (anh).
February 12, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Kurtz, Chad) (anh).
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Paul Leary, re #58 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/8/2021.(rmc)
February 5, 2021 Filing 59 Defendant Marriott International, Inc's ANSWER to #54 Amended Complaint (Second) and Demand for Jury Trial by Marriott International, Inc. (Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
February 5, 2021 Filing 58 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-15341245.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Leary, Paul) (rmc).
January 29, 2021 Filing 57 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Discovery Responses by Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Michael T. Houchin, #3 Table of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12)(Houchin, Michael) (tcf).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting #55 Joint Motion/Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Defendant SHALL RESPOND to the Second Amended Complaint on or before 2/8/2021. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/19/2021. (tcf)
January 15, 2021 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #54 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Class Action Complaint) by Marriott International, Inc. (Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
January 11, 2021 Filing 54 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Marriott International, Inc., filed by Todd Hall, Julie Drassinower, Kevin Branca, Jesse Heineken. (Marron, Ronald) (tcf).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Vacating Hearing Date on and Granting #46 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. #46 ). Plaintiff SHALL FILE the Second Amended Class Action Complaint, previously filed at ECF No. #46 -3, within three (3) days of the electronic docketing of this Order. Thereafter, the Clerk SHALL UPDATE the caption and docket accordingly. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/8/2021. (tcf)
January 7, 2021 Filing 52 NON Opposition re #46 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Alderfer, Amy) (tcf).
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel set for 2/26/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Please see order for further instructions and procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 1/6/2021.(hmw)
January 6, 2021 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Telephonic Discovery Conference, regarding multiple discovery disputes, held on 1/6/2021. The Court is hopeful that its guidance and further meet and confer efforts should resolve the disputes, but should issues remain, it will set a briefing schedule. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorneys Michael Houchin and Lilach Halperin). (Defendant Attorneys Amy B. Alderfer, Chad Kurtz, and Paul Leary). (no document attached) (hmw)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Setting Discovery Conference. Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 1/4/2021.(hmw)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Chad Kurtz, re #47 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/15/2020.(rmc)
December 15, 2020 Filing 47 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-15051327.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kurtz, Chad) (rmc).
December 8, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Ronald A. Marron, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Marron, Ronald) (tcf).
November 20, 2020 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Discovery Conference held on 11/20/2020. All issues were resolved. (Plaintiff Attorneys Ronald Marron and Michael Houchin). (Defendant Attorneys Amy Alderfer and Paul Leary). (no document attached) (hmw)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting #41 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/19/2020. (tcf)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting #42 Joint Motion for Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/19/2020. (tcf)
November 18, 2020 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Production of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) by Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marron, Ronald) (tcf).
November 18, 2020 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marron, Ronald) (tcf).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER Setting Discovery Deadlines and Class Certification Motion Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/6/2020. (tcf)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Following Case Management Conference. Counsel-only Discovery Videoconference set for 11/20/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Please see order for further deadlines and procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/6/2020.(hmw)
November 6, 2020 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Case Management Conference held on 11/6/2020. The Court will issue two orders in due course: a Scheduling Order and an Order Setting Discovery Conference. (ECR: hearing recorded on the Court's ZoomGov account. 2:10-2:26). (Plaintiff Attorneys Robert L. Teel and Ronald Marron). (Defendant Attorneys Amy B. Alderfer and Milton Anthony Marquis). (no document attached) (hmw)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER (1) Continuing Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE"), and (2) Affirming Case Management Conference ("CMC"). A counsel-only CMC will take place as scheduled on 11/6/2020 at 2:00 PM via videoconference and, after the Court confers with counsel, the ENE will be reset for a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/5/2020.(hmw)
October 29, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Errata by Todd Hall re #34 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Marron, Ronald) (jpp).
October 28, 2020 Filing 35 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Marron, Ronald) (tcf).
October 28, 2020 Filing 34 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Marron, Ronald) QC mailer sent re: wrong pdf attached (tcf).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference via videoconference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/6/2020 at 2:00pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/31/2020.(jpp) (dlg).
August 28, 2020 Filing 32 Defendant Marriott International, Inc's ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Marriott International, Inc..(Alderfer, Amy) (jpp).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying #18 Defendant Marriott International Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/14/2020. (jpp) (dlg).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #29 Plaintiff's application for leave to file supplemental response to Defendant's notice of supplemental authority. by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/12/2020. (jpp) (dlg).
June 10, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Supplemental Response to Defendants Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Todd Hall. (Teel, Robert) (jpp).
June 9, 2020 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Marriott International, Inc. re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint. (Taylor, Brett) (jpp).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER (1) Denying #26 Defendant's request for oral argument, and (2) Taking Defendant's motion to dismiss under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/28/2020.(jpp) (dlg).
February 27, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION Request for Oral Argument re Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint by Marriott International, Inc.. (Taylor, Brett)Attorney Brett N. Taylor added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
February 20, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19-cv-1715-JLS-AHG.(no document attached) (dsn)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Marilyn L. Huff hereby recuses from this case and directs the Clerk to randomly reassign this case to another district judge. This case has been randomly to Judge Jeffrey T. Miller for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff is no longer assigned to this case. All pending hearings previously set before Judge Marilyn L. Huff have been vacated. The new case number is 19-cv-1715-JM-AHG. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/10/2020. (no document attached) (smy)
February 3, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY - Other re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint - Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Alderfer, Amy)(sxa).
February 3, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Alderfer, Amy)(sxa).
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Milton A. Marquis, re #13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/30/2020.(rmc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #2 Opposition to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice)(Marron, Ronald)(sxa).
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court reschedules the hearing on the motion to dismiss (Doc. No. #18 ) to February 18, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. The briefing schedule remains the same, i.e. the opposition remains due on or before January 27, 2020 and the reply remains due on or before February 3, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/13/2020. (no document attached) (smy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint)(Alderfer, Amy)(sxa).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER:(1) GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; #16 (2) DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AS MOOT; AND #11 ; and (3) VACATING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/3/2019. (sjm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #15 Amended Complaint by Marriott International, Inc.. (Alderfer, Amy). Modified on 11/27/2019 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Marriott International, Inc., filed by Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Marron, Ronald). Modified on 11/25/2019 - Edited text to add "First" (jah).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Bryan L. Mosca (Re: ECF No. #9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/1/2019.(jrd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13130712.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Marquis, Milton) (rmc).
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Marriott International, Inc. re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint (Alderfer, Amy). Modified on 11/5/2019 - Edited text (jah).
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Alderfer, Amy). Modified on 11/5/2019 - Edited attachment description (jah).
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Alderfer, Amy). (jah).
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13114747.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Mosca, Bryan) (rmc).
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lilach Halperin on behalf of Todd Hall (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Halperin, Lilach). Attorney Lilach Halperin added to party Todd Hall (pty:pla). (jah).
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Houchin on behalf of Todd Hall (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Houchin, Michael). Attorney Michael Houchin added to party Todd Hall (pty:pla). (jah).
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Marriot International, Inc.'s answer to the Complaint due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/3/2019. (jah)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Marriot International, Inc.. (Alderfer, Amy). Attorney Amy B Alderfer added to party Marriot International, Inc. (pty:dft). Modified on 10/3/2019 - Pdf includes proposed order. Wrong event. QC Email sent. Corrected event and text (jah).
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Hall. All Defendants served. (Marron, Ronald) . (jah).
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Teel on behalf of Todd Hall (Teel, Robert). Attorney Robert L. Teel added to party Todd Hall(pty:pla). (jah).
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa) (jao).
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Marriot International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12919573.), filed by Todd Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01715-H-AHG. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Marron, Ronald)(sxa) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hall
Represented By: Ronald Marron
Represented By: Lilach Halperin
Represented By: Robert L. Teel
Represented By: Michael Houchin
Represented By: Sean L. Litteral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Heineken
Represented By: Ronald Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Drassinower
Represented By: Ronald Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Branca
Represented By: Ronald Marron
Represented By: Michael Houchin
Represented By: Sean L. Litteral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Abdelsayed
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Ronald Marron
Represented By: Michael Houchin
Represented By: Sean L. Litteral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ciglar
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriot International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., .
Represented By: Amy B Alderfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Amy B Alderfer
Represented By: Brett N. Taylor
Represented By: Bryan Mosca
Represented By: Milton Anthony Marquis
Represented By: Chad Kurtz
Represented By: Paul K. Leary, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?